EP3584210 - LIFTING TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Unitary effect registered Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for unitary effect filed Status updated on 28.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Decision on the request for unitary effect | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Proprietor(s) | For all participating member states High Performance Lifting Equipment B.V. Swammerdamlaan 10 6721 BK Bennekom / NL | [2024/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN DER KOLK, Boris Harold Johan Swammerdamlaan 10 6721 BK Bennekom / NL | [2019/52] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2024/41] | Application number, filing date | 19180432.7 | 17.06.2019 | [2019/52] | Procedural language | EN | (Principal) place of business Tooltip on the date of filing | Principal place of businessTooltip | Place of businessTooltip Swammerdamlaan 10 Bennekom / NL | [2024/41] | Unitary Patent Protection | 27.08.2024 | Date of request for unitary effect [2024/40] | 05.09.2024 | Decision on the request for unitary effect: Positive [2024/41] | 05.09.2024 | Date of registration [2024/41] | 31.07.2024 | Date of legal effect [2024/41] | Member States covered by Unitary Tooltip Patent Protection | 05.09.2024 | AT, BE, BG, DE, DK, EE, FI, FR, IT, LT, LU, LV, MT, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI [2024/41] | Publication | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3584210 | Date: | 31.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/31] |