EP3598397 - COMPUTER-IMPLEMENTED METHOD FOR CHECKING A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.09.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.10.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.07.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.09.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.10.2023 [2023/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fahrzeugwerk Bernard Krone GmbH & Co. KG Bernard-Krone-Straße 1 49757 Werlte / DE | [2020/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kunz, Kurt Neustadtstraße 34 49740 Haselünne / DE | 02 /
Kurka, Tim Kleiner Oldenkamp 7 26789 Leer / DE | 03 /
Ahrndt, Dirk Auf der Eislage 1 49626 Berge / DE | [2020/04] | Representative(s) | Busse & Busse Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 1226 49002 Osnabrück / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/04] | Pott, Ulrich, et al Busse & Busse Patentanwälte Grosshandelsring 6 49084 Osnabrück / DE | Application number, filing date | 19181236.1 | 19.06.2019 | [2020/04] | Priority number, date | DE201810117538 | 19.07.2018 Original published format: DE102018117538 | [2020/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3598397 | Date: | 22.01.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G07C5/08 | [2020/04] | CPC: |
G07C5/0808 (EP);
G07C5/0825 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/34] |
Former [2020/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | COMPUTERIMPLEMENTIERTES VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERPRÜFUNG EINES FAHRZEUGES | [2020/04] | English: | COMPUTER-IMPLEMENTED METHOD FOR CHECKING A VEHICLE | [2020/04] | French: | PROCÉDÉ MIS EN UVRE PAR ORDINATEUR DESTINÉ À LA VÉRIFICATION D'UN VÉHICULE | [2020/04] | Examination procedure | 15.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/34] | 15.07.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.05.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/42] | 31.05.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2023 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE102009058142 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 5,9 * paragraphs [0025] , [0 26] , [0 27] , [0 45] - paragraph [0048]; figure 2; claims 5,6 *; | [X]DE102011013760 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,15,16 * paragraphs [0068] , [0 87] , [0088] , [0089]; figures 10-12 *; | [XI]DE102012008284 (DAIMLER AG [DE]) [X] 1-4,11-13,15,16 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0035]; figures 1-3; claim 1 * [I] 14; | [X]DE102013016096 (AUDI AG [DE]) [X] 1-5,9,14-16 * paragraphs [0001] , [00 2] , [0 13] , [0036]; figure 1 *; | [XI]US2015202962 (HABASHIMA YOSHIYUKI [US], et al) [X] 1-11,15,16 * paragraphs [0051] , [0054] , [0058] , [0060] , [0080] - paragraph [0088]; figures 1,2,8a; claim 3 * [I] 14; | [A]DE102014014179 (DAIMLER AG [DE]) [A] 6* paragraphs [0022] , [0023] , [0024] , [0025]; figures 1-3 * |