EP3564133 - OPTIMIZING RANGE OF AIRCRAFT DOCKING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2020 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADB Safegate Sweden AB Djurhagegatan 19 213 76 Malmö / SE | [2019/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Håkansson, Ola Vårgatan 7 234 31 Lomma / SE | [2019/45] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/45] | AWA Sweden AB P.O. Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 19181477.1 | 21.03.2016 | [2019/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3564133 | Date: | 06.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B64F1/00, G08G5/06 | [2019/45] | CPC: |
B64F1/002 (EP,KR,US);
B64F1/00 (RU);
B64F1/18 (RU);
G01S17/42 (EP,KR,US);
G01S7/4802 (EP,KR,US);
G08G5/0026 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/45] | Title | German: | OPTIMIERUNG DER REICHWEITE EINES FLUGZEUG-ANDOCKSYSTEMS | [2019/45] | English: | OPTIMIZING RANGE OF AIRCRAFT DOCKING SYSTEM | [2019/45] | French: | OPTIMISATION DE LA PORTÉE D'UN SYSTÈME D'ATTERRISSAGE POUR AÉRONEF | [2019/45] | Examination procedure | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/46] | 24.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/46] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16161329.4 / EP3222529 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE4301637 (DEUTSCHE AEROSPACE [DE]); | [X]WO9620465 (GUSTAVSSON KENNETH [SE], et al); | [X]WO9915406 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al); | [X]US6023665 (MILLGARD LARS [SE]); | [X]US6282488 (CASTOR ROBERT [DE], et al); | [X]US2002030609 (BAUMGARTNER KLAUS [DE], et al); | [X]US6563432 (MILLGAARD LARS [SE]); | [X]WO2013141605 (ANSE TECHNOLOGIES CO LTD [KR]); | [A]EP2660153 (FMT INT TRADE AB [SE]); |