EP3716063 - SCALABLE MULTI-TENANT UNDERLAY NETWORK SUPPORTING MULTI-TENANT OVERLAY NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.08.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.08.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.04.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | 22.08.2024 | Withdrawal of application | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Juniper Networks, Inc. 1133 Innovation Way Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | [2020/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MACKIE, William Stuart c/o Juniper Networks, Inc 1133 Innovation Way Sunnyvale, CA California 94089 / US | 02 /
WIGET, Marcel c/o Juniper Networks, Inc 1133 Innovation Way Sunnyvale, CA California 94089 / US | [2020/40] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/40] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 19181482.1 | 20.06.2019 | [2020/40] | Priority number, date | US201916370091 | 29.03.2019 Original published format: US201916370091 | [2020/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3716063 | Date: | 30.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/50, H04L12/46 | [2020/40] | CPC: |
G06F9/5077 (EP,CN);
H04L12/4641 (EP,CN,US);
H04L45/64 (US);
H04L12/4633 (EP,CN);
H04L41/12 (US);
H04L45/586 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/18] |
Former [2020/40] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SKALIERBARES MANDANTENFÄHIGES OVERLAY-NETZWERK ZUR UNTERSTÜTZUNG EINES MANDANTENFÄHIGEN OVERLAY-NETZWERKS | [2020/40] | English: | SCALABLE MULTI-TENANT UNDERLAY NETWORK SUPPORTING MULTI-TENANT OVERLAY NETWORK | [2020/40] | French: | RÉSEAU SOUS-JACENT MULTI-LOCATAIRES ÉVOLUTIF PRENANT EN CHARGE UN RÉSEAU SOUS-JACENT MULTI-LOCATAIRES | [2020/40] | Examination procedure | 29.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/18] | 29.03.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2024 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/39] | 27.09.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | Divisional application(s) | EP24194951.0 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2019068493 (RAM SHASHANK [US], et al) |