EP3586693 - METHOD FOR MANAGING AN ESPRESSO COFFEE MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.11.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.12.2020 [2020/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Global Coffee Service F.V. Eichenhain N. 6 35641 Schoffengrund-Laufdorf / DE | [2020/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vettorel, Fabio Global Coffee Service F.V. Eichenhain N. 6 35641 schoffengrund-Laufdorf / DE | [2020/01] | Representative(s) | Citron, Massimiliano Via Primo Maggio, 6 31020 San Fior (TV) / IT | [2020/01] | Application number, filing date | 19181878.0 | 23.06.2019 | [2020/01] | Priority number, date | IT20180006645 | 26.06.2018 Original published format: IT201800006645 | [2020/01] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3586693 | Date: | 01.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A47J31/42, A47J31/52 | [2020/01] | CPC: |
A47J31/525 (EP);
A47J31/42 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN EINER ESPRESSO-KAFFEEMASCHINE | [2020/01] | English: | METHOD FOR MANAGING AN ESPRESSO COFFEE MACHINE | [2020/01] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE GESTION D'UNE MACHINE À CAFÉ EXPRESSO | [2020/01] | Examination procedure | 02.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/50] | 22.07.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/50] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP3042591 (GLOBAL COFFEE SERVICE F V [DE]) [AD] 1-12 * paragraphs [0005] - [0037]; figures 1,2; claims 1,11,13 *; | [A]WO2007027206 (COFFEE EQUIPMENT COMPANY [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0107] , [0108]; figure 11 *; | [A]US2014263780 (DAY JR NEIL M [US]) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0003] , [0 33] - [0050] - [0 71] - [0089]; figures 5A-8B * | by applicant | EP3042591 |