EP3757945 - DEVICE FOR GENERATING AN AUGMENTED REALITY IMAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.05.2023 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.07.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Imec VZW Kapeldreef 75 3001 Leuven / BE | [2021/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rosmeulen, Maarten IMEC VZW, Patent Department Kapeldreef 75 3001 Leuven / BE | [2021/01] | Representative(s) | Roth, Sebastian Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/01] | Roth, Sebastian Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19182040.6 | 24.06.2019 | [2021/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3757945 | Date: | 30.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06T15/50, G06T19/00, // G01S17/10 | [2021/01] | CPC: |
G06T15/503 (EP);
G06T15/40 (US);
G06T1/20 (US);
G06T15/20 (US);
G06T19/006 (EP,US);
G06T7/50 (US);
G06V20/20 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/31] |
Former [2021/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINES BILDES DER ERWEITERTEN REALITÄT | [2021/01] | English: | DEVICE FOR GENERATING AN AUGMENTED REALITY IMAGE | [2021/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR GÉNÉRER UNE IMAGE DE RÉALITÉ AUGMENTÉE | [2021/01] | Examination procedure | 30.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/31] | 30.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2017106053 (OCULUS VR LLC [US]); |