EP3572511 - COMPLEX CONTAINING OLIGONUCLEOTIDE HAVING IMMUNOPOTENTIATING ACTIVITY AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.09.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.05.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states National Institutes of Biomedical Innovation, Health and Nutrition 7-6-8, Saito-Asagi Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-0085 / JP | For all designated states Daiichi Sankyo Company, Limited 3-5-1, Nihonbashi Honcho Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8426 / JP | [2019/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISHII, Ken c/o National Institute of Biomedical Innovation Health and Nutrition 7-6-8, Saito-Asagi Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-0085 / JP | 02 /
KOBIYAMA, Kouji c/o National Institute of Biomedical Innovation Health and Nutrition 7-6-8, Saito-Asagi Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-0085 / JP | 03 /
AOSHI, Taiki c/o National Institute of Biomedical Innovation Health and Nutrition 7-6-8, Saito-Asagi Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-0085 / JP | 04 /
TAKESHITA, Fumihiko c/o Daiichi Sankyo Company Limited 3-5-1 Nihonbashi Honcho Chuo-ku, Tokyo 103-8426 / JP | 05 /
KASUYA, Yuji c/o Daiichi Sankyo Company Limited 1-2-58 Hiromachi Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 140-8710 / JP | 06 /
NIWA, Takako c/o Daiichi Sankyo Company Limited 1-2-58 Hiromachi Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 140-8710 / JP | 07 /
KOIZUMI, Makoto c/o Daiichi Sankyo Company Limited 1-2-58 Hiromachi Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 140-8710 / JP | [2019/48] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [2023/28] |
Former [2019/48] | J A Kemp LLP 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 19182054.7 | 19.09.2014 | [2019/48] | Priority number, date | JP20130196206 | 20.09.2013 Original published format: JP 2013196206 | [2019/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3572511 | Date: | 27.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3572511 | Date: | 12.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/7125, A61K31/713, A61K39/00, A61K39/02, A61K39/12, A61K39/145, A61K39/155, A61K39/39, A61P31/04, A61P31/12, A61P33/00, A61P35/00, A61P37/04, A61P37/08, A61P43/00, C08B37/00, C07H21/04, C12N15/09, C12N15/117 | [2023/09] | CPC: |
C12N15/117 (EP,KR,RU,US);
A61K31/7125 (EP,KR,RU,US);
A61K39/39 (EP,KR,RU,US);
A61K31/713 (EP,KR,RU,US);
A61K39/12 (EP,RU,US);
A61K39/145 (EP,KR,RU,US);
A61K39/155 (EP,KR,RU,US);
A61K47/61 (KR);
A61K47/6939 (KR);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP,KR);
A61P31/14 (EP);
A61P31/16 (EP);
A61P33/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP,KR);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP,KR);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07H21/04 (EP,KR,RU,US);
C08B37/0024 (EP,RU,US);
C12N7/00 (RU,US);
A61K2039/5252 (EP,US);
A61K2039/55561 (KR,US);
A61K2039/55583 (EP,KR,US);
C12N2310/17 (EP,US);
C12N2310/315 (EP,KR,US);
C12N2310/351 (US);
C12N2310/3519 (EP,US);
C12N2320/31 (EP,US);
C12N2760/16134 (EP,US);
C12N2760/18534 (EP,US);
Y02A50/30 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/48] | C12N15/09, A61K31/7125, A61K31/713, A61K39/02, A61K39/12, A61K39/39, A61P31/04, A61P31/12, A61P33/00, A61P35/00, A61P37/04, A61P37/08, A61P43/00, C07H21/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/27] |
Former [2019/48] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | KOMPLEX MIT EINEM OLIGONUKLEOTID MIT IMMUNPOTENZIERENDER WIRKUNG UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2019/48] | English: | COMPLEX CONTAINING OLIGONUCLEOTIDE HAVING IMMUNOPOTENTIATING ACTIVITY AND USE THEREOF | [2019/48] | French: | COMPLEXE CONTENANT UN OLIGONUCLÉOTIDE PRÉSENTANT UNE ACTIVITÉ IMMUNOPOTENTIALISATRICE ET SON UTILISATION | [2019/48] | Examination procedure | 27.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/27] | 27.05.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 01.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14846493.6 / EP3048170 | Divisional application(s) | EP23176351.7 / EP4253546 | Opposition(s) | 15.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.07.2023 | CZ | 12.07.2023 | DK | 12.07.2023 | EE | 12.07.2023 | FI | 12.07.2023 | HR | 12.07.2023 | LT | 12.07.2023 | LV | 12.07.2023 | MC | 12.07.2023 | NL | 12.07.2023 | PL | 12.07.2023 | RO | 12.07.2023 | RS | 12.07.2023 | SE | 12.07.2023 | SI | 12.07.2023 | SK | 12.07.2023 | SM | 12.07.2023 | IE | 19.09.2023 | LU | 19.09.2023 | BE | 30.09.2023 | NO | 12.10.2023 | GR | 13.10.2023 | IS | 12.11.2023 | PT | 13.11.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/33] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
EE | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
MC | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SK | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
IE | 19.09.2023 | ||
LU | 19.09.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/28] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
EE | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
MC | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SK | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
LU | 19.09.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
EE | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SK | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
LU | 19.09.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
EE | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SK | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 12.07.2023 | |
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/05] | NL | 12.07.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2003026782 (KRIEG ARTHUR M [US]) [Y] 1-15 * table 1; sequence 2a *; | [X] - HIROKO MIYAMOTO ET AL, "Selective Delivery of Oligonucletide Using a beta-1,3-glucan Receptor", CELLULOSE COMMUNICATIONS, UJI, JP, (20120101), vol. 19, no. 1, ISSN 1342-730X, pages 12 - 16, XP008183343 [X] 1-15 * figures 1-3 * | [XYI] - JUSAKU MINARI ET AL, "Enhanced Cytokine Secretion from Primary Macrophages due to Dectin-1 Mediated Uptake of CpG DNA/[beta]-1,3-Glucan Complex", BIOCONJUGATE CHEMISTRY, (20110119), vol. 22, no. 1, doi:10.1021/bc1001196, ISSN 1043-1802, pages 9 - 15, XP055317850 [X] 1-4,8,10,13,14 * page 10, column l, paragraph 1; figures 1-7 * [Y] 1-15 [I] 5-7,9,11,12,15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bc1001196 | [Y] - FUMIHIKO TAKESHITA ET AL, "Role of toll-like receptor 9 in CpG DNA-induced activation of human cells", THE JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF IMMUNOLOGISTS, US, (20011001), vol. 167, no. 7, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 3555 - 3558, XP002979099 [Y] 1-15 * figures 1-4 * | [Y] - TAKAHIRO TOUGAN ET AL, "TLR9 adjuvants enhance immunogenicity and protective efficacy of the SE36/AHG malaria vaccine in nonhuman primate models", HUMAN VACCINES & IMMUNOTHERAPEUTICS, United States, (20130201), vol. 9, no. 2, doi:10.4161/hv.22950, ISSN 2164-5515, pages 283 - 290, XP055357144 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4161/hv.22950 | [T] - BURCU TEMIZOZ ET AL, "Vaccine adjuvants as potential cancer immunotherapeutics", INTERNATIONAL IMMUNOLOGY., GB, (20160322), vol. 28, no. 7, doi:10.1093/intimm/dxw015, ISSN 0953-8178, pages 329 - 338, XP055356653 [T] 1-15 * page 334, column r, paragraph 6 - page 335, column l, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/intimm/dxw015 | Examination | - KITAHATA YUJI ET AL, "Circulating nano-particulate TLR9 agonist scouts out tumor microenvironment to release immunogenic dead tumor cells", ONCOTARGET, United States, (20160802), vol. 7, no. 31, doi:10.18632/oncotarget.10379, ISSN 1949-2553, pages 48860 - 48869, XP055801528 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.18632/oncotarget.10379 | by applicant | WO9526204 | WO0134207 | WO02072152 | JP2004107272 | WO2004100965 | JP2007070307 | JP2008100919 | JP2010174107 | US8030285 | JP2013196206 | - HEMMI, H. et al., "A Toll-like receptor recognizes bacterial DNA", Nature, (20000000), vol. 408, doi:doi:10.1038/35047123, pages 740 - 745, XP002221246 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/35047123 | - KRIEG, A.M., "Therapeutic potential of Toll-like receptor 9 activation", Nature reviews. Drug discovery, (20060000), vol. 5, doi:doi:10.1038/nrd2059, pages 471 - 484, XP008109144 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nrd2059 | - BRAZOLOT MILLAN, C.L.WEERATNA, R.KRIEG, A.M.SIEGRIST, C.A.DAVIS, H.L., "CpG DNA can induce strong Th1 humoral and cell-mediated immune responses against hepatitis B surface antigen in young mice", Proceedings of the National Academy of Sciences of the United States of America, (19980000), vol. 95, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.95.26.15553, pages 15553 - 15558, XP002148908 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.95.26.15553 | - CHU, R.S.TARGONI, O.S.KRIEG, A.M.LEHMANN, P.V.HARDING, C.V., "CpG oligodeoxynucleotides act as adjuvants that switch on T helper 1 (Thl) immunity", The Journal of experimental medicine, (19970000), vol. 186, doi:doi:10.1084/jem.186.10.1623, pages 1623 - 1631, XP002910130 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1084/jem.186.10.1623 | - KLINMAN, D.M., "Immunotherapeutic uses of CpG oligodeoxynucleotides", Nature reviews. Immunology, (20040000), vol. 4, doi:doi:10.1038/nri1329, pages 249 - 258, XP003006450 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nri1329 | - VOLLMER, J.KRIEG, A.M., "Immunotherapeutic applications of CpG oligodeoxynucleotide TLR9 agonists", Advanced drug delivery reviews, (20090000), vol. 61, doi:doi:10.1016/j.addr.2008.12.008, pages 195 - 204, XP025972624 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.addr.2008.12.008 | - KRUG, A. et al., "Identification of CpG oligonucleotide sequences with high induction of IFN-alpha/beta in plasmacytoid dendritic cells", European journal of immunology, (20010000), vol. 31, doi:doi:10.1002/1521-4141(200107)31:7<2154::AID-IMMU2154>3.0.CO;2-U, pages 2154 - 2163, XP002292085 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/1521-4141(200107)31:7<2154::AID-IMMU2154>3.0.CO;2-U | - VERTHELYI, D.ISHII, K.J.GURSEL, M.TAKESHITA, F.KLINMAN, D.M., "Human peripheral blood cells differentially recognize and respond to two distinct CPG motifs", Journal of immunology, (20010000), vol. 166, pages 2372 - 2377, XP002299044 | - HARTMANN, G.KRIEG, A.M., "Mechanism and function of a newly identified CpG DNA motif in human primary B cells", Journal of immunology, (20000000), vol. 164, pages 944 - 953 | - HARTMANN, G. et al., "Rational design of new CpG oligonucleotides that combine B cell activation with high IFN-alpha induction in plasmacytoid dendritic cells", European journal of immunology, (20030000), vol. 33, doi:doi:10.1002/eji.200323813, pages 1633 - 1641, XP009015493 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/eji.200323813 | - MARSHALL, J.D. et al., "Identification of a novel CpG DNA class and motif that optimally stimulate B cell and plasmacytoid dendritic cell functions", Journal of leukocyte biology, (20030000), vol. 73, doi:doi:10.1189/jlb.1202630, pages 781 - 792, XP002497698 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1189/jlb.1202630 | - SAMULOWITZ, U. et al., "A novel class of immune-stimulatory CpG oligodeoxynucleotides unifies high potency in type I interferon induction with preferred structural properties", Oligonucleotides, (20100000), vol. 20, doi:doi:10.1089/oli.2009.0210, pages 93 - 101, XP055360581 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/oli.2009.0210 | - KERKMANN, M. et al., "Spontaneous formation of nucleic acid-based nanoparticles is responsible for high interferon-alpha induction by CpG-A in plasmacytoid dendritic cells", The Journal of biological chemistry, (20050000), vol. 280, doi:doi:10.1074/jbc.M410868200, pages 8086 - 8093, XP002454062 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M410868200 | - KLEIN, D.C.LATZ, E.ESPEVIK, T.STOKKE, B.T., "Higher order structure of short immunostimulatory oligonucleotides studied by atomicforce microscopy", Ultramicroscopy, (20100000), vol. 110, doi:doi:10.1016/j.ultramic.2010.02.033, pages 689 - 693, XP027064230 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ultramic.2010.02.033 | - PUIG, M. et al., "Use of thermolytic protective groups to prevent G-tetrad formation in CpG ODN D type: structural studies and immunomodulatory activity in primates", Nucleic acids research, (20060000), vol. 34, doi:doi:10.1093/nar/gkl867, pages 6488 - 6495, XP055001852 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/gkl867 | - BODE, C.ZHAO, G.STEINHAGEN, F.KINJO, T.KLINMAN, D.M., "CpG DNA as a vaccine adjuvant", Expert review of vaccines, (20110000), vol. 10, doi:doi:10.1586/erv.10.174, pages 499 - 511, XP055551929 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1586/erv.10.174 | - MCHUTCHISON, J.G. et al., "Phase 1B, randomized, double-blind, dose-escalation trial of CPG 10101 in patients with chronic hepatitis C virus", Hepatology, (20070000), vol. 46, pages 1341 - 1349 | - OKAMURA, K. et al., "Clinical evaluation of schizophyllan combined with irradiation in patients with cervical cancer. A randomized controlled study", Cancer, (19860000), vol. 58, pages 865 - 872 | - OBA, K.KOBAYASHI, M.MATSUI, T.KODERA, Y.SAKAMOTO, J., "Individual patient based meta-analysis of lentinan for unresectable/recurrent gastric cancer", Anticancer Res., (20090000), vol. 29, pages 2739 - 2746 | - NAKANO, H.NAMATAME, K.NEMOTO, H.MOTOHASHI, H.NISHIYAMA, K.KUMADA, K., "A multi-institutional prospective study of lentinan in advanced gastric cancer patients with unresectable and recurrent diseases: Effect on prolongation of survival and improvement of quality of life", Hepato-Gastroenterol., (19990000), vol. 46, pages 2662 - 2668 | - SAKURAI, K.MIZU, M.SHINKAI, S., "Polysaccharide-polynucleotide complexes. 2. Complementary polynucleotide mimic behavior of the natural polysaccharide schizophyllan in the macromolecular complex with single- stranded RNA and DNA", Biomacromolecules, (20010000), vol. 2, doi:doi:10.1021/BM000121R, pages 641 - 650, XP002504242 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/BM000121R | - SHIMADA, N. et al., "A polysaccharide carrier to effectively deliver native phosphodiester CpG DNA to antigen-presenting cells", Bioconjugate chemistry, (20070000), vol. 18, doi:doi:10.1021/bc0700178, pages 1280 - 1286, XP055145914 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bc0700178 | - KOYAMA, S. et al., "Plasmacytoid dendritic cells delineate immunogenicity of influenza vaccine subtypes", Science translational medicine, (20100000), vol. 2, doi:doi:10.1126/scitranslmed.3000759, page 25ra24, XP055229166 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/scitranslmed.3000759 | - MINARI, J. et al., "Enhanced cytokine secretion from primary macrophages due to Dectin-1 mediated uptake of CpG DNA/beta-1,3-glucan complex", Bioconjugate chemistry, (20110000), vol. 22, doi:doi:10.1021/bc1001196, pages 9 - 15, XP055317850 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bc1001196 | - Advanced drug delivery reviews, (20090000), vol. 61, pages 195 - 204 | - VERTHELYI, D. et al., Journal of immunology, (20010000), vol. 166, pages 2372 - 2377 | - Journal of immunology, (20000000), vol. 164, pages 944 - 953 | - HAMURO, J. et al., Immunology, (19800000), vol. 39, pages 551 - 559 | - HAMURO, J. et al., Int. J. Immunopharmacol., (19800000), vol. 2, page 171 | - HERLYN, D. et al., Gann, (19850000), vol. 76, pages 37 - 42 | - TABATA, K.ITO, W.KOJIMA, T.KAWABATA, S.MISAKI A., Carbohydr. Res., (19810000), vol. 89, no. 1, pages 121 - 135 | - SHIMIZUCHINHASUMIMASUBUCHI, Biotherapy, (19900000), vol. 4, page 1390 | - HASEGAWA, Oncology and Chemotherapy, (19920000), vol. 8, page 225 | - THERESA, M. MCINTIREDAVID, A. BRANT, J. Am. Chem. Soc., (19980000), vol. 120, page 6909 | - KOYAMA, S. et al., Science translational medicine, (20100000), vol. 2, page 25ra24 | - SAIJO, S. et al., Nature immunology, (20070000), vol. 8, pages 39 - 46 | - SHIMADA, N. et al., Bioconjugate chemistry, (20070000), vol. 18, pages 1280 - 1286 | - MINARI, J. et al., Bioconjugate chemistry, (20110000), vol. 22, pages 9 - 15 | - BAE, A.H. et al., Carbohydrate research, (20040000), vol. 339, pages 251 - 258 | - KLEIN, D.C. et al., Ultramicroscopy, (20100000), vol. 110, pages 689 - 693 | - COSTA, L.T. et al., Biochemical and biophysical research communications, (20040000), vol. 313, pages 1065 - 1072 | - KRUG, A. et al., European journal of immunology, (20010000), vol. 31, pages 2154 - 2163 | - GURSEL, M. et al., Journal of leukocyte biology, (20020000), vol. 71, pages 813 - 820 | - GUIDUCCI, C. et al., The Journal of experimental medicine, (20060000), vol. 203, pages 1999 - 2008 | - HERRE, J. et al., Blood, (20040000), vol. 104, pages 4038 - 4045 | - GOODRIDGE, H.S. et al., Nature, (20110000), vol. 472, pages 471 - 475 | - EBERLE, M.E.DALPKE, A.H., Journal of immunology, (20120000), vol. 188, pages 5644 - 5654 | - HEMMI, H. et al., Nature, (20000000), vol. 408, pages 740 - 745 | - MARTINEZ-POMARES, L.GORDON, S., Trends in immunology, (20120000), vol. 33, pages 66 - 70 | - AOSHI, T. et al., European journal of immunology, (20090000), vol. 39, pages 417 - 425 | - GRAY, E.E.CYSTER, J.G., Journal of innate immunity, (20120000), vol. 4, pages 424 - 436 | - GONZALEZ, S.F. et al., Nature immunology, (20100000), vol. 11, pages 427 - 434 | - SUZUKI, K. et al., The Journal of experimental medicine, (20090000), vol. 206, pages 1485 - 1493 | - AOSHI, T. et al., Immunity, (20080000), vol. 29, pages 476 - 486 |