EP3756916 - HEATING AND/OR AIR CONDITIONING SYSTEM WITH INTERNAL HEAT EXCHANGERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.07.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.04.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Konvekta Aktiengesellschaft Am Nordbahnhof 5 34613 Schwalmstadt-Ziegenhain / DE | [2021/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sonnekalb, Michael Konvekta Aktiengesellschaft Am Schulhof 5 34613 Schwalmstadt / DE | [2021/01] | Representative(s) | Lindinger, Bernhard Akazienweg 20 34117 Kassel / DE | [2021/01] | Application number, filing date | 19182073.7 | 24.06.2019 | [2021/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3756916 | Date: | 30.12.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3756916 | Date: | 27.09.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B60H1/32, F25B40/00, F25B25/00, F25B5/04, F25B6/04, F25B49/02, // B60H1/00 | [2023/16] | CPC: |
B60H1/32284 (EP);
F25B1/00 (CN);
B60H1/00371 (CN);
B60H1/00878 (CN);
B61D27/0018 (CN);
F25B40/00 (EP);
F25B49/02 (EP,CN);
F25B5/04 (EP);
F25B6/04 (EP);
B60H2001/00949 (CN);
B60H2001/00957 (EP);
F25B2339/047 (EP);
F25B2400/04 (CN);
F25B2400/05 (EP);
F25B2400/054 (EP);
F25B25/005 (EP);
F25B2600/13 (EP);
F25B2700/19 (CN);
F25B2700/1933 (EP);
F25B2700/195 (EP);
F25B2700/21 (CN);
|
Former IPC [2021/01] | B60H1/32, F25B40/00, F25B25/00, // B60H1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/01] | Title | German: | HEIZ- UND/ODER KLIMAANLAGE MIT INTERNEN WÄRMETAUSCHERN | [2021/01] | English: | HEATING AND/OR AIR CONDITIONING SYSTEM WITH INTERNAL HEAT EXCHANGERS | [2021/01] | French: | INSTALLATION DE CHAUFFAGE ET / OU DE CLIMATISATION POURVUE D'ÉCHANGEURS DE CHALEUR INTERNES | [2021/01] | Examination procedure | 31.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.09.2020 | Examination requested [2020/53] | 15.09.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 21.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 21.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 21.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 27.09.2023 | ES | 27.09.2023 | HR | 27.09.2023 | RO | 27.09.2023 | RS | 27.09.2023 | SK | 27.09.2023 | SM | 27.09.2023 | NO | 27.12.2023 | GR | 28.12.2023 | IS | 27.01.2024 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/20] | HR | 27.09.2023 | |
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/11] | HR | 27.09.2023 | |
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 27.12.2023 | |
GR | 28.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2174810 (SCANIA CV ABP [SE]) [A] 12,13* the whole document *; | [X]JP2011117685 (SHARP KK) [X] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [XI]US2017227260 (TAKAYAMA YASUNORI [JP], et al) [X] 1-9 * the whole document * [I] 10-17 | by applicant | DE10247667 | EP1623857 | DE102005005430 | KR20150023090 | FR3030700 | DE102016103085 | WO2018042091 | DE102018100814 |