EP3579581 - GRANTING ACCESS RIGHTS TO A SUB-SET OF THE DATA SET IN A USER ACCOUNT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.04.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.06.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Widex A/S Nymøllevej 6 3540 Lynge / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2019/50] | For all designated states WIDEX A/S Nymøllevej 6 3540 Lynge / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WESTERMANN, Søren Erik c/o Widex A/S Nymøllevej 6 DK-3540 Lynge / DK | 02 /
ANDERSEN, Svend Vitting c/o Widex A/S Nymøllevej 6 DK-3540 Lynge / DK | 03 /
MARETTI, Niels Erik Boelskift c/o Widex A/S Nymøllevej 6 DK-3540 Lynge / DK | 04 /
WESTERGAARD, Anders c/o Widex A/S Nymøllevej 6 DK-3540 Lynge / DK | [2019/50] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 19182120.6 | 20.11.2014 | [2019/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3579581 | Date: | 11.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3579581 | Date: | 26.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04R25/00 | [2019/50] | CPC: |
H04R25/554 (EP,US);
H04R25/558 (US);
G06F21/6245 (US);
H04L9/3268 (US);
H04R25/505 (US);
H04R25/70 (EP,US);
G06F2221/2115 (US);
G06F2221/2141 (US);
H04L9/50 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/30] |
Former [2019/50] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | GEWÄHRUNG VON ZUGRIFFSRECHTEN FÜR EINEN UNTERSATZ EINES DATENSATZES BEI EINEM BENUTZERKONTO | [2019/50] | English: | GRANTING ACCESS RIGHTS TO A SUB-SET OF THE DATA SET IN A USER ACCOUNT | [2019/50] | French: | CESSION DE DROITS D'ACCÈS À UN SOUS-ENSEMBLE DE L'ENSEMBLE DE DONNÉES DANS UN COMPTE UTILISATEUR | [2019/50] | Examination procedure | 22.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/30] | 12.06.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.04.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 15.04.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.04.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14799817.3 / EP3222056 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
28.02.2022
02.03.2022
ADMISSIBLE GN Hearing A/S / Oticon A/S Lautrupbjerg 7 / Kongebakken 9 2750 Ballerup / 2765 Smørum / DK Opponent's representative Aera A/S Niels Hemmingsens Gade 10, 5th Floor 1153 Copenhagen K / DK | [2022/14] | 15.03.2022 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 13.07.2022 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 15.06.2023 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.07.2023 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 17.07.2023 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 27.07.2023 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2023/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.11.2014 | AL | 26.05.2021 | AT | 26.05.2021 | CY | 26.05.2021 | CZ | 26.05.2021 | EE | 26.05.2021 | ES | 26.05.2021 | FI | 26.05.2021 | HR | 26.05.2021 | IT | 26.05.2021 | LT | 26.05.2021 | LV | 26.05.2021 | MC | 26.05.2021 | MK | 26.05.2021 | MT | 26.05.2021 | NL | 26.05.2021 | PL | 26.05.2021 | RO | 26.05.2021 | RS | 26.05.2021 | SE | 26.05.2021 | SI | 26.05.2021 | SK | 26.05.2021 | SM | 26.05.2021 | BG | 26.08.2021 | NO | 26.08.2021 | GR | 27.08.2021 | IS | 26.09.2021 | PT | 27.09.2021 | IE | 20.11.2021 | LU | 20.11.2021 | BE | 30.11.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 20.11.2014 | |
AL | 26.05.2021 | ||
AT | 26.05.2021 | ||
CY | 26.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
IT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
MC | 26.05.2021 | ||
MK | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SI | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
IE | 20.11.2021 | ||
LU | 20.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 20.11.2014 | |
AL | 26.05.2021 | ||
AT | 26.05.2021 | ||
CY | 26.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
IT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
MC | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SI | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
IE | 20.11.2021 | ||
LU | 20.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 26.05.2021 | |
AT | 26.05.2021 | ||
CY | 26.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
IT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
MC | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SI | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
IE | 20.11.2021 | ||
LU | 20.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AL | 26.05.2021 | |
AT | 26.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
IT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
MC | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SI | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
IE | 20.11.2021 | ||
LU | 20.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 26.05.2021 | |
AT | 26.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
IT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
MC | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SI | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
LU | 20.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 26.05.2021 | |
AT | 26.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
MC | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SI | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
LU | 20.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 26.05.2021 | |
AT | 26.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
MC | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SI | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 26.05.2021 | |
AT | 26.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SI | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 26.05.2021 | |
AT | 26.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/04] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0154458 (STARKEY LAB INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 4, line 27 - line 28 * * page 6, line 9 - line 10 * * page 6, line 18 * * page 6, line 29 - line 33 * * page 7, line 8 ** page 8, line 13 - page 9, line 6 *; | [A]WO2006001998 (JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 5, line 4 - line 13 *; | [I]US2013177189 (BRYANT GREGORY ALLEN [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 1,3 * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0022] * | Opposition | US7200237 | EP2183928 | US2011176686 | US2012183165 | US2013177189 | US2013177188 | US8503703 | US2013266165 | US2013315424 | WO2014094866 | US2014334629 | EP3039886 |