EP3599602 - ELECTRONIC DEVICE CAPABLE OF REDUCING COLOR SHIFT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.02.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.09.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states InnoLux Corporation No. 160 Kesyue Road Jhu-Nan Site Hsinchu Science Park Jhu-Nan, Miao-Li County 350 / TW | [2024/11] |
Former [2020/05] | For all designated states InnoLux Corporation No. 160 Kesyue Road Chu-Nan Site Hsinchu Science Park Chu-Nan, Miao-Li 350 / TW | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tseng, Ming-Chun No. 160 Kesyue Rd., Jhu-Nan Site, Hsinchu Science Park, Jhu-Nan 350 Miao-Li County / TW | 02 /
Ting, Chin-Lung No. 160 Kesyue Rd., Jhu-Nan Site, Hsinchu Science Park, Jhu-Nan 350 Miao-Li County / TW | 03 /
Kuo, Kung-Chen No. 160 Kesyue Rd., Jhu-Nan Site, Hsinchu Science Park, Jhu-Nan 350 Miao-Li County / TW | 04 /
Kao, Ker-Yih No. 160 Kesyue Rd., Jhu-Nan Site, Hsinchu Science Park, Jhu-Nan 350 Miao-Li County / TW | 05 /
Wei, Chung-Kuang No. 160 Kesyue Rd., Jhu-Nan Site, Hsinchu Science Park, Jhu-Nan 350 Miao-Li County / TW | 06 /
Hsieh, Chih-Yung No. 160 Kesyue Rd., Jhu-Nan Site, Hsinchu Science Park, Jhu-Nan 350 Miao-Li County / TW | 07 /
Mao, Li-Wei No. 160 Kesyue Rd., Jhu-Nan Site, Hsinchu Science Park, Jhu-Nan 350 Miao-Li County / TW | 08 /
Chen, Ho-Tien No. 160 Kesyue Rd., Jhu-Nan Site, Hsinchu Science Park, Jhu-Nan 350 Miao-Li County / TW | 09 /
Wen, Cheng-Fu No. 160 Kesyue Rd., Jhu-Nan Site, Hsinchu Science Park, Jhu-Nan 350 Miao-Li County / TW | [2020/05] | Representative(s) | Straus, Alexander, et al 2K Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bajuwarenring 14 82041 Oberhaching / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2024/29] | Straus, Alexander, et al 2K Patent- und Rechtsanwälte - München Keltenring 9 82041 Oberhaching / DE | ||
Former [2020/05] | Straus, Alexander, et al 2K Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Dr. Alexander Straus Keltenring 9 82041 München / Oberhaching / DE | Application number, filing date | 19182470.5 | 26.06.2019 | [2020/05] | Priority number, date | US201862702355P | 24.07.2018 Original published format: US 201862702355 P | US201862733593P | 19.09.2018 Original published format: US 201862733593 P | CN20191005691 | 03.01.2019 Original published format: CN201910005691 | CN201910385594 | 09.05.2019 Original published format: CN201910385594 | [2020/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3599602 | Date: | 29.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3599602 | Date: | 25.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3599602 | Date: | 17.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/3233, G09G3/20 | [2020/05] | CPC: |
G09G3/3233 (EP);
G09G3/22 (US);
G09G3/2011 (US);
G09G3/2014 (EP,US);
G09G3/2081 (US);
G09G3/32 (US);
G09G3/3406 (US);
G09G2300/08 (US);
G09G2300/0809 (EP);
G09G2300/0838 (EP);
G09G2300/0842 (EP);
G09G2300/0861 (EP);
G09G2300/0871 (EP);
G09G2310/0202 (US);
G09G2310/0254 (US);
G09G2310/0289 (US);
G09G2310/06 (US);
G09G2310/08 (US);
G09G2320/0242 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0633 (US);
G09G2320/064 (US);
G09G2320/0646 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/44] |
Former [2020/05] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ZUR REDUZIERUNG VON FARBVERSCHIEBUNG FÄHIGE, ELEKTRISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2020/05] | English: | ELECTRONIC DEVICE CAPABLE OF REDUCING COLOR SHIFT | [2020/05] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE CAPABLE DE RÉDUIRE LE DÉCALAGE DE COULEURS | [2020/05] | Examination procedure | 18.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.09.2020 | Examination requested [2020/44] | 18.09.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 05.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002047817 (TAM SIMON [GB]); | [A]US2006176256 (YEN CHENG-CHI [TW], et al); | [Y]US2013082906 (TOYOMURA NAOBUMI [JP], et al); | [XY]US2014218272 (KIKUCHI KEN [JP], et al); | [XI]US2016351130 (KIKUCHI KEN [JP], et al); | [A]US2017206832 (LEE JAE KWAN [KR], et al); |