EP3588938 - IMAGE PICKUP APPARATUS CAPABLE OF PERFORMING IMAGE PICKUP WITH REDUCED FLICKER INFLUENCE, METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE SAME, PROGRAM, AND STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.07.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.07.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PL, PT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2020/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUGAWARA, Atsushi c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | 02 /
TAKAKI, Yasuhito c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | 03 /
SHINTANI, Takuya c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | 04 /
MORITA, Takuro c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | 05 /
MATSUMOTO, Yukihiro c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2023/33] |
Former [2020/01] | 01 /
SUGAWARA, Atsushi c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | ||
02 /
TAKAKI, Yasuhito c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | |||
03 /
SHINTANI, Takuya c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | |||
04 /
MORITA, Takuro c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | |||
05 /
MATSUMOTO, Yukihiro c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, 146-8501 / JP | Representative(s) | Canon Europe Limited European Intellectual Property Group 4 Roundwood Avenue Stockley Park Uxbridge UB11 1AF / GB | [2023/52] |
Former [2020/01] | Williamson, Brian, et al Canon Europe Limited European Patent Department 3 The Square Stockley Park Uxbridge, Middlesex UB11 1ET / GB | Application number, filing date | 19182530.6 | 26.06.2019 | [2020/01] | Priority number, date | JP20180125529 | 29.06.2018 Original published format: JP 2018125529 | JP20180125530 | 29.06.2018 Original published format: JP 2018125530 | JP20180125531 | 29.06.2018 Original published format: JP 2018125531 | JP20180125532 | 29.06.2018 Original published format: JP 2018125532 | JP20180125533 | 29.06.2018 Original published format: JP 2018125533 | JP20190093204 | 16.05.2019 Original published format: JP 2019093204 | [2020/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3588938 | Date: | 01.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3588938 | Date: | 27.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04N23/745 | [2023/29] | CPC: |
H04N23/745 (EP,CN,US);
H04N23/50 (CN);
G03B7/093 (US);
H04N23/54 (CN);
H04N23/55 (CN);
H04N23/56 (CN);
H04N23/60 (EP);
H04N23/667 (CN);
H04N23/70 (EP);
H04N23/71 (US);
H04N23/72 (US);
H04N23/73 (CN,US);
H04N23/74 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/01] | H04N5/235 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/32] |
Former [2020/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BILDAUFNAHMEVORRICHTUNG, DIE ZUR BILDAUFNAHME MIT REDUZIERTEM FLACKEREFFEKT GEEIGNET IST, VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG DAVON, PROGRAMM UND SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2020/01] | English: | IMAGE PICKUP APPARATUS CAPABLE OF PERFORMING IMAGE PICKUP WITH REDUCED FLICKER INFLUENCE, METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE SAME, PROGRAM, AND STORAGE MEDIUM | [2020/01] | French: | APPAREIL DE CAPTURE D'IMAGES APTE À EFFECTUER UNE CAPTURE D'IMAGES AVEC UNE INFLUENCE DE SCINTILLEMENT RÉDUITE, PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE ASSOCIÉ, PROGRAMME ET SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT | [2020/01] | Examination procedure | 29.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/32] | 01.07.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 20.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23210845.6 / EP4322544 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.12.2023 | CZ | 27.12.2023 | EE | 27.12.2023 | ES | 27.12.2023 | FI | 27.12.2023 | HR | 27.12.2023 | IT | 27.12.2023 | LT | 27.12.2023 | LV | 27.12.2023 | NL | 27.12.2023 | PL | 27.12.2023 | RO | 27.12.2023 | RS | 27.12.2023 | SE | 27.12.2023 | SK | 27.12.2023 | SM | 27.12.2023 | BG | 27.03.2024 | NO | 27.03.2024 | GR | 28.03.2024 | IS | 27.04.2024 | PT | 29.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 27.12.2023 | |
CZ | 27.12.2023 | ||
EE | 27.12.2023 | ||
ES | 27.12.2023 | ||
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
NL | 27.12.2023 | ||
RO | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
SM | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
IS | 27.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | EE | 27.12.2023 | |
ES | 27.12.2023 | ||
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
NL | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
SM | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
IS | 27.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 27.12.2023 | |
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
NL | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
SM | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
IS | 27.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 27.12.2023 | |
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
NL | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
IS | 27.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | ES | 27.12.2023 | |
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
NL | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | ES | 27.12.2023 | |
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | FI | 27.12.2023 | |
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 28.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2008049132 (SUZUKI SHOICHI [JP]) [Y] 6 * the whole document *; | [YA]US2009295940 (SHIBUNO KOJI [JP]) [Y] 15 * paragraph [0085] - paragraph [0087] * [A] 1-14,16-20; | [A]US2012026358 (HIROSE MINORU [JP]) [A] 1-20* paragraph [0086] - paragraph [0089] *; | [Y]US2015002694 (HASEGAWA REIJI [JP]) [Y] 4,5 * figures 1-10 *; | [XYI]US2018027166 (UCHIDA AKIHIRO [JP]) [X] 1-3,18 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0138]; figure 20 * [Y] 4-11,13-15 [I] 2-17,19,20; | [Y]US2018167545 (KOSAKA TAKASHI [JP]) [Y] 7-11,13,14 * column 2 - column 56 * | by applicant | JP2009213076 |