EP3758040 - PHOTO-CATHODE FOR A VACUUM SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.03.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hamamatsu Photonics K.K. 1126-1, Ichino-cho Chuo-ku Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | [2024/42] |
Former [2022/43] | For all designated states Danmarks Tekniske Universitet Anker Engelunds Vej 101 2800 Kongens Lyngby / DK | ||
For all designated states Hamamatsu Photonics K.K. 1126-1, Ichino-cho Higashi-ku Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | |||
Former [2021/01] | For all designated states Technical University of Denmark Anker Engelundsvej 1, Building 101A 2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK | ||
For all designated states Hamamatsu Photonics K.K. 1126-1, Ichino-cho Higashi-ku Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JEPSEN, Peter Uhd Obdams Alle 16 2300 Copenhagen S / DK | 02 /
LANGE, Simon Lehnskov Frimestervej 38, 4.th 2400 Copenhagen NV / DK | 03 /
SUYAMA, Motohiro c/o Hamamatsu Photonics K.K. 1126-1, Ichino-cho, Higashi-ku Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | 04 /
IGUCHI, Masahiko c/o Hamamatsu Photonics K.K. 1126-1, Ichino-cho, Higashi-ku Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | [2021/01] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2021/01] | Application number, filing date | 19182534.8 | 26.06.2019 | [2021/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3758040 | Date: | 30.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H01J1/34, // H01J1/304 | [2021/01] | CPC: |
H01J1/34 (EP,CN,US);
H01J31/507 (US);
H01J40/06 (US);
H01J43/246 (US);
H01J1/3042 (EP);
H01J2201/342 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PHOTOKATHODE FÜR EIN VAKUUMSYSTEM | [2021/01] | English: | PHOTO-CATHODE FOR A VACUUM SYSTEM | [2021/01] | French: | PHOTO-CATHODE POUR UN SYSTÈME À VIDE | [2021/01] | Examination procedure | 28.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/53] | 28.04.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4591717 (SCHERBER WERNER [DE]); | [XY]JP2006074021 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [XY]US2007228355 (SINGH BRAHM PAL [JP]); | [XYI]US2016343532 (CHUANG YUNG-HO ALEX [US], et al) | by applicant | WO2015028029 |