EP3587957 - HEAT PUMP AND METHOD OF CONTROLLING HEAT PUMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.07.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES THERMAL SYSTEMS, LTD. 2-3, Marunouchi 3-Chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 100-8332 / JP | For all designated states CHUBU ELECTRIC POWER CO., INC. 1 Higashi-shincho Higashi-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 461-8680 / JP | For all designated states THE KANSAI ELECTRIC POWER CO., INC. 6-16, Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8270 / JP | [2023/32] |
Former [2020/01] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES THERMAL SYSTEMS, LTD. 16-5, Konan 2-chome Minato-ku 108-8215 Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states Chubu Electric Power Company, Incorporated 1 Higashi-shincho Higashi-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 461-8680 / JP | |||
For all designated states The Kansai Electric Power Co., Inc. 6-16, Nakanoshima 3-Chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8270 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOBAYASHI, Takayuki c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES THERMAL SYSTEMS LTD. 16-5, Konan 2-chome Minato-ku TOKYO, 108-8215 / JP | 02 /
MAENO, Masashi c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES THERMAL SYSTEMS LTD. 16-5, Konan 2-chome Minato-ku TOKYO, 108-8215 / JP | 03 /
KATSURAYAMA, Yohei c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD. 2-3, Marunouchi 3-Chome, Chiyoda-ku TOKYO, 100-8332 / JP | 04 /
NAKAYAMA, Hiroshi c/o CHUBU ELECTRIC POWER CO., INC. 1 Higashi-shincho, Higashi-ku NAGOYA, AICHI, 461-8680 / JP | 05 /
TOKUNAGA, Yasuharu c/o THE KANSAI ELECTRIC POWER CO., INC. 6-16, Nakanoshima 3-chome, Kita-ku OSAKA-SHI, OSAKA, 530-8270 / JP | [2020/01] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2020/01] | Application number, filing date | 19182535.5 | 26.06.2019 | [2020/01] | Priority number, date | JP20180123707 | 28.06.2018 Original published format: JP 2018123707 | [2020/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3587957 | Date: | 01.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3587957 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F25B1/10, F25B5/02, F25B41/00, F25B47/02, F25B49/02, // F25B9/00, F25B13/00, F25B25/00 | [2023/12] | CPC: |
F25B1/10 (EP,US);
F25B41/20 (EP,US);
F25B41/24 (EP,US);
F25B47/025 (EP);
F25B49/02 (EP);
F25B5/02 (EP);
F25B13/00 (EP);
F25B2313/02791 (EP);
F25B25/005 (EP);
F25B2600/2519 (EP);
F25B2700/21163 (EP);
F25B2700/21175 (EP);
F25B9/008 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/01] | F25B1/10, F25B5/02, F25B41/00, F25B41/04, F25B47/02, F25B49/02, // F25B9/00, F25B13/00, F25B25/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/32] |
Former [2020/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | WÄRMEPUMPE UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG DER WÄRMEPUMPE | [2020/01] | English: | HEAT PUMP AND METHOD OF CONTROLLING HEAT PUMP | [2020/01] | French: | POMPE À CHALEUR ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE POMPE À CHALEUR | [2020/01] | Examination procedure | 29.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/32] | 29.06.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 24.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 30.08.2023 | HR | 30.08.2023 | PL | 30.08.2023 | RO | 30.08.2023 | RS | 30.08.2023 | SK | 30.08.2023 | SM | 30.08.2023 | NO | 30.11.2023 | GR | 01.12.2023 | IS | 30.12.2023 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/20] | HR | 30.08.2023 | |
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | HR | 30.08.2023 | |
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | NO | 30.11.2023 | |
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 30.11.2023 | |
GR | 01.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP2878900 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0116]; figures 1-6 *[A] 3-13; | [XA]US2015168037 (ARIYAMA TADASHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0381]; figures 1-7 * [A] 3-13; | [XA]EP3242096 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0135]; figures 13-17 * [A] 3-13 | by applicant | JP2016090102 |