EP3575342 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR LASER SINTERING WITH PRETREATED MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 28.10.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.06.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2022 | Refusal of application | published on 30.11.2022 [2022/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Advanced Laser Materials LLC 3115 Lucius McCelvey Drive Temple, TX 76504 / US | [2019/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vanelli, Donald Lewis 2017 Canyon Creek Drive Temple, TX Texas 76502 / US | 02 /
Booth, Richard Benton 112 Jessie Lane Bluffon, TX Texas 78607 / US | 03 /
Thornton, Bruce 4110 Spyglass Katy, TX Texas 77450 / US | [2019/49] | Representative(s) | Beckord & Niedlich Patentanwälte PartG mbB Marktplatz 17 83607 Holzkirchen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/49] | Beckord & Niedlich Patentanwälte PartG mbB Marktplatz 17 83607 Holzkirchen / DE | Application number, filing date | 19182632.0 | 10.12.2012 | [2019/49] | Priority number, date | US201161630443P | 12.12.2011 Original published format: US 201161630443 P | [2019/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3575342 | Date: | 04.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C08G69/26, C08J3/00, B29C67/00, // B29B13/02, C08G69/02, C08G69/14, C08L77/02, C08L77/06, C08G85/00 | [2019/49] | CPC: |
C08G69/14 (EP,US);
B29B13/021 (EP,US);
B33Y70/00 (EP,RU,US);
C08F10/02 (US);
C08F10/06 (US);
C08G69/02 (EP,US);
C08G69/26 (EP,US);
C08G69/265 (EP,RU,US);
C08G85/002 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/28] |
Former [2019/49] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM FÜR LASERSINTER MIT VORBEHANDELTEM MATERIAL | [2019/49] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR LASER SINTERING WITH PRETREATED MATERIAL | [2019/49] | French: | MÉTHODE ET SYSTÈME POUR FRITTAGE LASER AVEC UN MATÉRIAU PRÉTRAITÉ | [2019/49] | Examination procedure | 28.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/28] | 28.05.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 03.02.2022 | 03.02.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 03.06.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.07.2022 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 12.07.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2022/48] | 22.07.2022 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2022/48] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12806802.0 / EP2791209 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004102539 (MONSHEIMER SYLVIA [DE], et al) [X] 1-17 * paragraphs [0022] , [0033] , [0058] , [0097]; example -; claim - *; | [X]US2004138344 (ALLEN JEAN-PHILIPPE [FR], et al) [X] 1-17* paragraphs [0002] - [0004] - [0007] , [0071] - [0082]; claim - *; | [X]US2005027050 (MONSHEIMER SYLVIA [DE], et al) [X] 1-17 * paragraphs [0017] , [0062] , [0063] , [0068] - [0070]; example -; claim - *; | [X]US2006071359 (MONSHEIMER SYLVIA [DE], et al) [X] 1-17 * paragraphs [0002] , [0042] , [0065] , [0099] , [0136] - [0138]; example -; claim - * |