EP3598008 - FLUID DISTRIBUTOR INSTALLATION SYSTEM FOR HEATING AND/OR COOLING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.08.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.07.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.2024 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states REHAU Industries SE & Co. KG Helmut-Wagner-Straße 1 95111 Rehau / DE | [2022/37] |
Former [2022/13] | For all designated states REHAU Industries SE & Co. KG Otto-Hahn-Str. 2 95111 Rehau / DE | ||
Former [2020/48] | For all designated states REHAU AG + Co Otto-Hahn-Str. 2 95111 Rehau / DE | ||
Former [2020/04] | For all designated states REHAU AG + Co Otto-Hahn-Strasse 2 95111 Rehau / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baur-Dürr, Stephan Am Holzacker 41 91085 Weisendorf / DE | 02 /
Koch, Klaus Paul Hermann-Löns-Straße 9 90513 Zirndorf / DE | [2020/04] | Application number, filing date | 19183522.2 | 01.07.2019 | [2020/04] | Priority number, date | DE201820104070U | 16.07.2018 Original published format: DE 202018104070 U | [2020/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3598008 | Date: | 22.01.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F24D3/10 | [2020/04] | CPC: |
F24D3/1075 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/35] |
Former [2020/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLUIDVERTEILER-MONTAGESYSTEM FÜR EIN HEIZ- UND/ODER KÜHLSYSTEM | [2020/04] | English: | FLUID DISTRIBUTOR INSTALLATION SYSTEM FOR HEATING AND/OR COOLING SYSTEM | [2020/04] | French: | SYSTÈME DE MONTAGE DE DISTRIBUTEUR DE FLUIDE POUR UN SYSTÈME DE CHAUFFAGE ET / OU DE REFROIDISSEMENT | [2020/04] | Examination procedure | 22.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/35] | 22.07.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE19912617 (SBK GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]DE10029490 (SCHUETZ GMBH & CO KGAA [DE]) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [X]EP2014991 (SANG SHIN CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,4-6 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0024]; figure 2 *; | [X]US2012298226 (STRUEMPLER JAKE JARED [US]) [X] 1,3-5 * paragraphs [0029] , [0 67] - [0072]; figures 1, 2, 7(a), 7(b), 9(a) *; | [X]EP2636933 (AFRISO EURO INDEX GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0017]; figures 3, 4 *; | [A]EP2674681 (REHAU AG & CO [DE]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]CN103727313 (HUANG XIAOFENG) [A] 1,2* the whole document *; | [X]EP3045743 (SBK SIEGFRIED BÖHNISCH KUNSTSTOFFTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0035]; figures 1, 2, 3, 16 * | by applicant | DE3043422 | DE19912617 |