EP3594083 - AN ACTUATION DEVICE FOR ACTUATING RAILROAD SWITCHES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.11.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.07.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Silsud S.R.L. Via Morolense 3/B 03013 Ferentino, Frosinone / IT | [2020/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BECCARISI, Alessandro Viale Cortina d'Ampezzo, 47 00135 ROMA / IT | 02 /
BIAGIOTTI, Maurizio Via Luca Pacioli 3 56124 PISA / IT | [2020/03] | Representative(s) | De Milato, Francesco, et al ABM - Agenzia Brevetti & Marchi Patents Viale Giovanni Pisano, 31 56123 Pisa / IT | [2020/03] | Application number, filing date | 19184113.9 | 03.07.2019 | [2020/03] | Priority number, date | IT20180007073 | 10.07.2018 Original published format: IT201800007073 | [2020/03] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3594083 | Date: | 15.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B61L5/10, B61L5/02 | [2020/03] | CPC: |
B61L5/10 (EP);
B61L5/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/34] |
Former [2020/03] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BETÄTIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EISENBAHNWEICHEN | [2020/03] | English: | AN ACTUATION DEVICE FOR ACTUATING RAILROAD SWITCHES | [2020/03] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ACTIONNEMENT POUR AIGUILLAGES FERROVIAIRES | [2020/03] | Examination procedure | 05.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/35] | 14.07.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]GB191003935 (THOMSON HUGH ALEXANDER); | [Y]GB224726 (SAMUEL SUMMERSON WRIGHTSON, et al); | [XI]US2168790 (BONE HERBERT L); | [XI]GB538125 (LLEWELYN WYNN WILLIAMS); | [XAYI]FR2905922 (VOSSLOH COGIFER SA [FR]) | by applicant | FR2905922 |