EP3607816 - ASSEMBLY FOR ROOF GREENING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/07] | WATER RETENTION ELEMENT AND ASSEMBLY FOR ROOF GREENING | ||
[2022/38] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.09.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.07.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Paul Bauder GmbH & Co. KG Korntaler Landstrasse 63 70499 Stuttgart / DE | [2020/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bauder, Tim Florian-Geyer-Str. 40 70499 Stuttgart / DE | 02 /
Ruttensperger, Stefan Breitenstr. 14 71296 Heimsheim / DE | [2020/07] | Representative(s) | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [2020/07] | Application number, filing date | 19184169.1 | 03.07.2019 | [2020/07] | Priority number, date | DE201810119175 | 07.08.2018 Original published format: DE102018119175 | [2020/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3607816 | Date: | 12.02.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3607816 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A01G9/033, E04D11/00 | [2020/07] | CPC: |
E04D11/002 (EP);
A01G9/033 (EP);
Y02A30/254 (EP);
Y02B80/32 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/34] |
Former [2020/07] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG FÜR EINE DACHBEGRÜNUNG | [2022/38] | English: | ASSEMBLY FOR ROOF GREENING | [2022/38] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR UNE TOITURE VÉGÉTALE | [2022/38] |
Former [2020/07] | WASSERRETENTIONSELEMENT UND ANORDNUNG FÜR EINE DACHBEGRÜNUNG | ||
Former [2020/07] | WATER RETENTION ELEMENT AND ASSEMBLY FOR ROOF GREENING | ||
Former [2020/07] | ÉLÉMENT DE RÉTENTION D'EAU ET DISPOSITIF POUR UNE TOITURE VÉGÉTALE | Examination procedure | 13.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/34] | 13.07.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 05.01.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.01.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 07.06.2023 | ES | 07.06.2023 | HR | 07.06.2023 | MC | 07.06.2023 | PL | 07.06.2023 | RO | 07.06.2023 | RS | 07.06.2023 | SK | 07.06.2023 | SM | 07.06.2023 | IE | 03.07.2023 | GR | 08.09.2023 | IS | 07.10.2023 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/16] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
MC | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 07.06.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3712867 (RIECO BEGRUENUNGSSYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [A] 7* figure 1; claim 7 *; | [A]FR2703213 (SMAC ACIEROID [FR]) [A] 7 * figure 1 *; | [X]US5383314 (ROTHBERG HENRY M [US]) [X] 1-15 * figure 4 *; | [X]JPH1175568 (KYODO KY TEC KK) [X] 1-15 * figures 26a-b *; | [X]DE19750277 (GUTJAHR WALTER [DE]) [X] 1-15 * figures 1-2 *; | [X]DE10111413 (GEFINEX GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0037] - [0039]; figures 1, 4 *; | [X]GB2484739 (G LTD AB [GB]) [X] 1-15 * page 1, lines 19-22; figures 1-4 * * page 5, line 9 *; | [X]EP2681989 (LARSEN AS [DK]) [X] 1-15 * column 1, lines 21-22; figures 1-3; claim 9 *; | [X]WO2017003373 (LIM JEE KENG [SG]) [X] 1-15 * figures 1-6c * | Examination | - Bauder, "Gründach-Systeme Produktübersicht", (20130801), pages 1 - 20, URL: http://www.digdach.at/assets/downloads/Bauder-Gründach_Produktübersicht_0813_DE.pdf, (20210218), XP055777684 | - ZinCo, "Floradrain FD40", ZinCo GmbH - Produktdatenblatt, (20170401), URL: https://www.zinco.de/sites/default/files/products/data_sheets/2017-04/ZinCo_PDB_Floradrain_FD40.pdf, (20200826), XP055725303 | by applicant | DE19852561 | DE10330318 |