EP3599560 - RETROACTIVE INFORMATION SEARCHING ENABLED BY NEURAL SENSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 27.05.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.09.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.07.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.2022 | Refusal of application | published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Harman International Industries, Incorporated 400 Atlantic Street, 15th Floor Stamford, CT 06901 / US | [2020/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VERBEKE, Joseph 1511 9th Ave, Apt 3 San Francisco, California 94122 / US | 02 /
KRATZ, Sven 4617 Hampton Falls Pl San Jose, California 95136 / US | 03 /
MARTI, Stefan 22 Starview Drive Oakland, California 94618-2329 / US | [2020/05] | Representative(s) | Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner, Patentanwälte mbB Werinherstraße 79 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/05] | Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Werinherstrasse 79 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19184430.7 | 04.07.2019 | [2020/05] | Priority number, date | US201816044438 | 24.07.2018 Original published format: US201816044438 | [2020/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3599560 | Date: | 29.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06F16/332, A61B5/00 | [2020/05] | CPC: |
G06F16/3329 (EP);
G06F16/90332 (US);
A61B5/165 (EP);
A61B5/374 (EP);
A61B5/749 (EP);
G06F16/636 (US);
G06F16/9535 (US);
G06F3/015 (US);
G06F40/40 (US);
G10L15/22 (US);
G10L15/24 (US);
G10L15/26 (US);
G10L2015/225 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/36] |
Former [2020/05] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DURCH NEURONALE MESSUNG ERMÖGLICHTE, RETROAKTIVE INFORMATIONSSUCHE | [2020/05] | English: | RETROACTIVE INFORMATION SEARCHING ENABLED BY NEURAL SENSING | [2020/05] | French: | RECHERCHE D'INFORMATIONS RÉTROACTIVES ACTIVÉE PAR DÉTECTION NEURONALE | [2020/05] | Examination procedure | 29.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/36] | 29.07.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.2022 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2022/26] | 20.01.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 09.02.2022 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 11.02.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2022/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2017068670 (ORR RYAN M [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0102] - [0126]; figure 1 *; | [Y]US2017281086 (DONALDSON THOMAS ALAN [GB]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0002] , [0004] , [0008] , [0065] , [0068] , [0128] , [0143] , [0222]; figure 1 * |