EP3590782 - TRACTIVE EFFORT SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.08.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.04.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.09.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Transportation IP Holdings, LLC 901 Main Avenue Norwalk, CT 06851 / US | [2022/23] |
Former [2022/18] | For all designated states GE Global Sourcing LLC 901 Main Avenue Norwalk, CT 06851 / US | ||
Former [2020/02] | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WORDEN, Bret Dwayne 2901 East Lake Road 42-3 Lawrence Park, PA Pennsylvania 16531 / US | 02 /
KUMAR, Ajith Kuttannair 2901 East Lake Road Lawrence Park, PA Pennsylvania 16531 / US | 03 /
TAMBE, Nikhil Subhashchandra John F Welch Technology Centre Whitefield Road Hoodi Village Whitefield Road, Phase 1, First Floor, Cluster 6 560066 Bangalore, Karnataka / IN | 04 /
KUMAR, Anubhav John F Welch Technology Centre Whitefield Road Hoodi Village Whitefield Road 560066 Bangalore, Karnataka / IN | 05 /
GARULE, Milind Bharat John F Welch Technology Centre Whitefield Road Hoodi Village Whitefield Road 560066 Bangalore, Karnataka / IN | 06 /
COYNE, Jennifer Lynn 2901 East Lake Road 42-323 Lawrence Park, PA Pennsylvania 16531 / US | 07 /
MALONE, Matthew John 2901 East Lake Road 63-1E Lawrence Park, PA Pennsylvania 16531 / US | [2021/37] |
Former [2020/02] | 01 /
WORDEN, Bret Dwayne 2901 East Lake Road 42-3 Lawrence Park, PA Pennsylvania 16531 / US | ||
02 /
KUMAR, Ajith Kuttannnair 2901 East Lake Road Lawrence Park, PA Pennsylvania 16531 / US | |||
03 /
TAMBE, Nikhil Subhashchandra John F Welch Technology Centre Whitefield Road Hoodi Village Whitefield Road, Phase 1, First Floor, Cluster 6 560066 Bangalore, Karnataka / IN | |||
04 /
KUMAR, Anubhav John F Welch Technology Centre Whitefield Road Hoodi Village Whitefield Road 560066 Bangalore, Karnataka / IN | |||
05 /
GARULE, Milind Bharat John F Welch Technology Centre Whitefield Road Hoodi Village Whitefield Road 560066 Bangalore, Karnataka / IN | |||
06 /
COYNE, Jennifer Lynn 2901 East Lake Road 42-323 Lawrence Park, PA Pennsylvania 16531 / US | |||
07 /
MALONE, Matthew John 2901 East Lake Road 63-1E Lawrence Park, PA Pennsylvania 16531 / US | Representative(s) | Laufhütte, Dieter Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 23 80538 München / DE | [2020/02] | Application number, filing date | 19184570.0 | 05.07.2011 | [2020/02] | Priority number, date | US201037188610P | 09.08.2010 Original published format: US 37188610 P | [2020/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3590782 | Date: | 08.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3590782 | Date: | 15.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B61C15/10 | [2020/02] | CPC: |
B61C15/107 (EP,US);
B61C15/102 (CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/02] | Title | German: | ZUGKRAFTSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN | [2020/02] | English: | TRACTIVE EFFORT SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2020/02] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'EFFORT DE TRACTION | [2020/02] | Examination procedure | 05.07.2019 | Examination requested [2020/02] | 03.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.08.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 10.08.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.08.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11730858.5 / EP2603412 | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 05.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.07.2011 | AL | 15.09.2021 | AT | 15.09.2021 | CY | 15.09.2021 | CZ | 15.09.2021 | DK | 15.09.2021 | EE | 15.09.2021 | ES | 15.09.2021 | FI | 15.09.2021 | HR | 15.09.2021 | IT | 15.09.2021 | LT | 15.09.2021 | LV | 15.09.2021 | MC | 15.09.2021 | MK | 15.09.2021 | MT | 15.09.2021 | NL | 15.09.2021 | PL | 15.09.2021 | RO | 15.09.2021 | RS | 15.09.2021 | SE | 15.09.2021 | SI | 15.09.2021 | SK | 15.09.2021 | SM | 15.09.2021 | BG | 15.12.2021 | NO | 15.12.2021 | GR | 16.12.2021 | IS | 15.01.2022 | PT | 17.01.2022 | [2024/44] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 05.07.2011 | |
AL | 15.09.2021 | ||
AT | 15.09.2021 | ||
CY | 15.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
IT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
MK | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 05.07.2011 | |
AL | 15.09.2021 | ||
AT | 15.09.2021 | ||
CY | 15.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
IT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 05.07.2011 | |
AL | 15.09.2021 | ||
AT | 15.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
IT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
AT | 15.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
IT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
AT | 15.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
IT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
AT | 15.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
AT | 15.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 15.09.2021 | |
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 15.09.2021 | |
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 15.09.2021 | |
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 15.09.2021 | |
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | FI | 15.09.2021 | |
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | FI | 15.09.2021 | |
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | FI | 15.09.2021 | |
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | LT | 15.09.2021 | |
NO | 15.12.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US1121710 (CARNES ALBERT H [US]) [X] 6 * figure 5 * [A] 1; | [XAYI]FR637918 (SOUILLARD) [X] 7 * the whole document * [A] 1 [Y] 11-15[I] 8-10; | [XY]FR791751 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1,6 * figure 1 * [Y] 11-15; | [XY]US2155214 (AIKMAN BURTON S) [X] 1-4,6 * figures 6,7 * [Y] 11-15; | [XA]US2426499 (FRANTZ VIRGIL L) [X] 6 * figure 1 * [A] 1; | [A]US3020071 (THOMAS MAKINSON) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [XY]US3020072 (FRANTZ VIRGIL L) [X] 1,6 * figure 1 * [Y] 11-15; | [XY]US3024797 (FRANTZ VIRGIL L) [X] 1,6 * figure 1 * [Y] 11-15; | [A]DE1195793 (KLOECKNER HUMBOLDT DEUTZ AG) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [XA]DE1242257 (KNORR BREMSE GMBH) [X] 6 * figures 1,2 * [A] 1; | [A]US4230045 (FEARON JOSEPH G) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [XA]DE19547746 (GOLDMANN NORBERT [DE], et al) [X] 6 * figure 2 * [A] 1; | [A]DE19640559 (DUEWAG AG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2003197386 (DALRYMPLE JAMES GRAEME [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [XAYI]DE102005001404 (KES KESCHWARI ELECTRONIC SYSTE [DE]) [X] 7 * figures 2,3 * [A] 1 [Y] 11-15 [I] 8-10; | [A]WO2006088880 (GEN ELECTRIC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [XA]WO2008061650 (GOLDMANN NORBERT [DE], et al) [X] 6 * abstract * [A] 1; | [A]DE102007044367 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-15; | [XA]WO2010031831 (NOWE GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 6 * figure 1 * [A] 1; | [E]AT509817 (KOMPETENZZENTRUM DAS VIRTUELLE FAHRZEUG FORSCHUNGSGMBH [AT]) [E] 7 * figures 1,2; claim 1 * |