Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024183444 | Global Dossier | 06.06.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202016928420 | 14.07.2020 | US202318545443 | 19.12.2023 | US201815916529 | 09.03.2018 | US202217824082 | 25.05.2022 | DE102017204336 | 15.03.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11859717 | Global Dossier | 02.01.2024 | B2 | US2022403931 | 22.12.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202016928420 | 14.07.2020 | US201815916529 | 09.03.2018 | US202217824082 | 25.05.2022 | DE102017204336 | 15.03.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11346443 | Global Dossier | 31.05.2022 | B2 | US2020408300 | 31.12.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202016928420 | 14.07.2020 | US201815916529 | 09.03.2018 | DE102017204336 | 15.03.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3869067 | Global Dossier | 01.05.2024 | C0 | EP3869067 | Global Dossier | 01.05.2024 | B1 | EP3869067 | 25.08.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP18161532 | 13.03.2018 | DE102017204336 | 15.03.2017 | EP19184832 | 13.03.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3575633 | Global Dossier | 05.05.2021 | B1 | EP3575633 | 04.12.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP18161532 | 13.03.2018 | DE102017204336 | 15.03.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10718431 | Global Dossier | 21.07.2020 | B2 | US2018266552 | 20.09.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102017204336 | 15.03.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3376067 | Global Dossier | 10.07.2019 | B1 | EP3376067 | 19.09.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102017204336 | 15.03.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN108625265B | Global Dossier | 18.08.2020 | B | CN108625265 | 09.10.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102017204336 | 15.03.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN208293377U | 28.12.2018 | U | Priority number | Date | DE102017204336 | 15.03.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102017204336 | 20.09.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102017204336 | 15.03.2017 | Type | Divisional application | EP3869067 | Type | Earlier application | EP3376067 |