EP3699122 - ACCESSORY DEVICE FOR FACILITATING THE FEEDING OF SHEETS OF MATERIAL TO BE CUT IN NUMERICAL CONTROL MACHINES (NCMS), AND NMC COMPRISING SAID ACCESSORY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.07.2021 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.08.2021 [2021/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Comelz S.p.A. Viale Indipendenza 55 27029 Vigevano / IT | [2020/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CORSICO PICCOLINO, Alessandro Viale Indipendenza, 55 27029 Vigevano (PV) / IT | [2020/35] | Representative(s) | Botti, Mario, et al Botti & Ferrari S.p.A. Via Cappellini, 11 20124 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2020/35] | Botti, Mario Botti & Ferrari S.r.l. Via Cappellini, 11 20124 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 19184940.5 | 08.07.2019 | [2020/35] | Priority number, date | EP20190158068 | 19.02.2019 Original published format: EP 19158068 | [2020/35] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3699122 | Date: | 26.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B65H5/04, C14B17/06, B26D5/20, B26D5/22, B65H20/18, A41H3/00, B26D5/00, C14B5/00, D06H7/00 | [2020/35] | CPC: |
B26D7/025 (EP);
B26D7/0625 (EP);
B65H5/04 (EP);
C14B17/06 (EP);
C14B5/00 (EP);
D06H7/00 (EP);
B26F1/3813 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSATZVORRICHTUNG ZUM ERLEICHTERN DER ZUFÜHRUNG VON BÖGEN VON ZU SCHNEIDENDEM MATERIAL IN NUMERISCH GESTEUERTEN MASCHINEN (NCM) UND NMC MIT DER ZUSATZVORRICHTUNG | [2020/35] | English: | ACCESSORY DEVICE FOR FACILITATING THE FEEDING OF SHEETS OF MATERIAL TO BE CUT IN NUMERICAL CONTROL MACHINES (NCMS), AND NMC COMPRISING SAID ACCESSORY DEVICE | [2020/35] | French: | DISPOSITIF ACCESSOIRE POUR FACILITER L'ALIMENTATION DE FEUILLES DE MATÉRIAU À DÉCOUPER DANS DES MACHINES À COMMANDE NUMÉRIQUE (NCMS) ET MACHINE À COMMANDE NUMÉRIQUE COMPRENANT LEDIT DISPOSITIF ACCESSOIRE | [2020/35] | Examination procedure | 27.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/33] | 24.03.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/33] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]GB848162 (MELKA AB) [X] 1,2 * page 1, paragraph 2; figures 1,2 * [A] 3-10,12,15 [Y] 11,14 [I] 13; | [A]US6624381 (HAFFNER SERGE LUC [FR]) [A] 1,11* page 1, column 2, line 75 - page 2, column 1, line 21; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]EP2022741 (ATOM SPA [IT]) [Y] 14 * figure 2 *; | [Y]CN107313237 (GUANGDONG ESQUEL TEXTILES CO, et al) [Y] 11,14 * figure 1 * |