EP3593767 - ORTHESIS WITH AT LEAST ONE SHELL-SHAPED SUPPORT PART [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.07.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.03.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.02.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Efinger Orthopädietechnik GmbH Brettreichstr. 11 97074 Würzburg / DE | For all designated states Sternkopf, Sönke Dornbuschweg 3 97249 Eisingen / DE | [2020/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STERNKOPF, Sönke Dornbuschweg 3 97249 Eisingen / DE | [2020/03] | Representative(s) | advotec. Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft Tappe mbB Beethovenstrasse 5 97080 Würzburg / DE | [2022/35] |
Former [2020/03] | advotec. Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Beethovenstrasse 5 97080 Würzburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 19185106.2 | 09.07.2019 | [2020/03] | Priority number, date | DE201810116872 | 12.07.2018 Original published format: DE102018116872 | [2020/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3593767 | Date: | 15.01.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3593767 | Date: | 31.08.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61F5/01, A61F5/058, A61F5/37, B33Y80/00, A61F5/055 | [2020/03] | CPC: |
A61F5/05891 (EP);
A61F5/3707 (EP);
B33Y80/00 (EP);
A61F2005/0172 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/11] |
Former [2020/03] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ORTHESE MIT ZUMINDEST EINEM SCHALENARTIGEN STÜTZTEIL | [2020/03] | English: | ORTHESIS WITH AT LEAST ONE SHELL-SHAPED SUPPORT PART | [2020/03] | French: | ORTHÈSE DOTÉE D'AU MOINS UNE PARTIE DE SUPPORT EN FORME DE COQUILLE | [2020/03] | Examination procedure | 30.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/11] | 30.01.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.07.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 01.06.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 31.08.2022 | CZ | 31.08.2022 | DK | 31.08.2022 | EE | 31.08.2022 | ES | 31.08.2022 | FI | 31.08.2022 | HR | 31.08.2022 | IT | 31.08.2022 | LT | 31.08.2022 | LV | 31.08.2022 | MC | 31.08.2022 | NL | 31.08.2022 | PL | 31.08.2022 | RO | 31.08.2022 | RS | 31.08.2022 | SE | 31.08.2022 | SI | 31.08.2022 | SK | 31.08.2022 | SM | 31.08.2022 | NO | 30.11.2022 | GR | 01.12.2022 | IS | 31.12.2022 | PT | 02.01.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/14] | AL | 31.08.2022 | |
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
EE | 31.08.2022 | ||
ES | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
MC | 31.08.2022 | ||
NL | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SI | 31.08.2022 | ||
SK | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 31.08.2022 | |
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
EE | 31.08.2022 | ||
ES | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
NL | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SI | 31.08.2022 | ||
SK | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 31.08.2022 | |
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
EE | 31.08.2022 | ||
ES | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
NL | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SK | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 31.08.2022 | |
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
EE | 31.08.2022 | ||
ES | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SK | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | CZ | 31.08.2022 | |
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
EE | 31.08.2022 | ||
ES | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SK | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | CZ | 31.08.2022 | |
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
ES | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/21] | DK | 31.08.2022 | |
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | FI | 31.08.2022 | |
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | FI | 31.08.2022 | |
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | FI | 31.08.2022 | |
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | FI | 31.08.2022 | |
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 31.08.2022 | |
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 31.08.2022 | |
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]US3374785 (GAYLORD JR JOHN F) [X] 1,2,9,13 * column 2, line 64 - column 2, line 69 * [A] 3-6 [Y] 8; | [XAY]US7018351 (IGLESIAS JOSEPH M [US], et al) [X] 1,2,9-13 * Abbildungen 1 + 6 * * column 2, line 37 - column 2, line 40 * * column 3, line 23 - column 3, line 35 * * column 4, line 48 - column 5, line 11 * * column 5, line 62 - column 6, line 13 * * column 7, line 4 - column 7, line 8 * [A] 3-6 [Y] 8; | [XAY]DE202013101385U (MEINEL ALBRECHT [DE]) [X] 1,2,7,13 * paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0015] * [A] 3-6 [Y] 8; | [XA]WO2015006766 (USARTHRO LLC [US]) [X] 1 * page 11, line 8 - page 12, line 2 *[A] 3-6; | [YA]CN106214308 (UNIV BEIJING FRIENDSHIP HOSPITAL CAPITAL MEDICAL) [Y] 8 * Abstract * * paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0035] * [A] 3-6 | Examination | EP2319967 | WO2017042550 | DE102016207651 |