EP3663915 - SCHEDULING TASK GRAPH OPERATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.10.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.05.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa, 211-8588 / JP | [2020/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MANDAL, Avradip c/o Fujitsu Laboratories of America, Inc. 1240 East Arques Ave Sunnyvale, California 94085 / US | 02 /
ROY, Arnab c/o Fujitsu Laboratories of America, Inc 1240 East Arques Ave Sunnyvale, California 94085 / US | 03 /
KHANIJAU, Gagan 3701 Parkview Ln, Apt. 9D Irvine, CA 92612 / US | [2020/24] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Cheapside House 138 Cheapside London EC2V 6BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/24] | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 19185204.5 | 09.07.2019 | [2020/24] | Priority number, date | US201816212354 | 06.12.2018 Original published format: US201816212354 | [2020/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3663915 | Date: | 10.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06N3/08, G06F9/48, G06F9/50, G06N5/022, G06N3/042, G06N20/00 | [2023/39] | CPC: |
G06F9/4843 (EP);
G06F9/5027 (CN);
G06N20/00 (EP,US);
G06F9/5066 (EP);
G06N3/042 (EP);
G06N3/08 (EP);
G06N5/022 (EP);
G06F2209/484 (EP);
G06N3/044 (EP);
G06N3/045 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/24] | G06F9/48, G06F9/50, G06N20/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/25] |
Former [2020/24] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PLANUNG VON AUFGABENGRAPHOPERATIONEN | [2020/24] | English: | SCHEDULING TASK GRAPH OPERATIONS | [2020/24] | French: | PROGRAMMATION D'OPÉRATIONS GRAPHIQUES DE TÂCHES | [2020/24] | Examination procedure | 13.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/25] | 13.05.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/30] | 20.03.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2024/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2018247197 (TUCKER PAUL A [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [I] - Sayed Hadi Hashemi ET AL, "TicTac: Accelerating Distributed Deep Learning with Communication Scheduling", (20181004), URL: https://arxiv.org/pdf/1803.03288v2.pdf, (20200129), XP055663295 [I] 1-14 * abstract * * figures 1,3,4,5 * * page 1, column l, line 12 - line 20 * * page 1, column r, line 4 - line 15 * * page 2, column l, line 23 - line 30 * * page 2, column r, line 47 - line 55 * * page 3, column l, line 1 - line 35 * * page 4, column l, line 10 - line 25 * * page 4, column r, line 20 - line 45 * * page 5, column l, line 10 - line 55 * * page 5, column r, line 5 - line 55 * * page 7, column l, line 3 - line 20 * * page 8, column l, line 50 - line 57 * * page 8, column r, line 25 - line 45 * | [A] - Martin Abadi ET AL, "TensorFlow: A System for Large-Scale Machine Learning", Proceedings of the 12th USENIX Symposium on Operating Systems Design and Implementation (OSDI '16)., (20161104), URL: https://www.usenix.org/system/files/conference/osdi16/osdi16-abadi.pdf, (20170711), XP055389572 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * | [A] - Mu Li ET AL, "Graph Partitioning via Parallel Submodular Approximation to Accelerate Distributed Machine Learning", (20150518), URL: https://arxiv.org/pdf/1505.04636.pdf, (20200120), XP055663297 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * |