EP3763746 - METHOD FOR PREPARING MINIEMULSIONS COMPRISING SUPERHYDROPHOBIC MONOMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.05.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.07.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.05.2023 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.06.2023 [2023/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clariant International Ltd Rothausstrasse 61 4132 Muttenz / CH | [2021/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PITARCH LOPEZ, Jesus Wilhelm-Busch-Str. 35 60431 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 02 /
KLEINBLOTEKAMP, Jochen In der Quelle 43 63303 Dreieich / DE | 03 /
SAHL, Mike Erzgebirgstr. 14 65520 Bad Camberg / DE | 04 /
STOPPEL, Yasemin Loreleistraße 39 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2021/02] | Representative(s) | Paczkowski, Marcus Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH Patent & License Management Chemicals Industriepark Höchst / G 860 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2021/02] | Application number, filing date | 19185375.3 | 10.07.2019 | [2021/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3763746 | Date: | 13.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C08F2/22, A61K8/06, C08F2/24, C08F2/30, C08F220/18 | [2021/02] | CPC: |
C08F2/22 (EP);
A61K8/062 (EP);
A61K8/39 (EP);
A61K8/556 (EP);
A61Q19/00 (EP);
C08F120/18 (EP);
C08F2/24 (EP);
C08F2/30 (EP);
C08F220/1804 (EP);
C08F220/1812 (EP);
A61K2800/10 (EP);
A61K2800/21 (EP);
A61K2800/596 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08F220/1804, C08F212/08 (EP);
C08F220/1804, C08F220/1812, C08F212/08 (EP);
C08F220/1812, C08F212/08, C08F220/1804 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/33] |
Former [2021/02] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON MINIEMULSIONEN MIT SUPERHYDROPHOBEN MONOMEREN | [2021/02] | English: | METHOD FOR PREPARING MINIEMULSIONS COMPRISING SUPERHYDROPHOBIC MONOMERS | [2021/02] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE MINI-ÉMULSIONS COMPRENANT DES MONOMÈRES SUPERHYDROPHOBES | [2021/02] | Examination procedure | 09.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/33] | 13.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.05.2023 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2023/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5686518 (FONTENOT KEVIN J [US], et al) [X] 1,13,14 * col. 4, lines 7-16 and 56-67; column 3, line 34 - line 55; example 1; claim 1 * [I] 2-12; | [XI]US2005176894 (JEONG YANG-SEUNG [KR], et al) [X] 1,13,14 * paragraphs [0016] , [0 17] , [0 22]; claims 2, 13, 14; table 1 * [I] 2-12; | [XI]EP2851377 (SYNTHOMER DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1,13,14 * paragraph [0023]; paragraph [0092] - paragraph [0095]; claim 1; table 1 * [I] 2-12; | [XDI] - BOSCÁN FREDDY ET AL, "From miniemulsion to nanoemulsion polymerization of superhydrophobic monomers through low energy phase inversion temperature", JOURNAL OF INDUSTRIAL AND ENGINEERING CHEMISTRY, (20170902), vol. 58, doi:10.1016/J.JIEC.2017.08.052, ISSN 1226-086X, pages 1 - 8, XP085314603 [XD] 13,14 * page 2 - page 7 * [I] 13,14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jiec.2017.08.052 | by applicant | - ASUA, JOSE M., "Challenges for industrialization of miniemulsion polymerization", Progress in Polymer Science, (20140000), vol. 39, doi:doi:10.1016/j.progpolymsci.2014.02.009, pages 1797 - 1826, XP029056115 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.progpolymsci.2014.02.009 | - BASCAN, F. et al., "From miniemulsion to nanoemulsion polymerization of superhydrophobic monomers through low energy phase inversion temperature", Journal of Industrial and Engineering Chemistry, (20180000), vol. 58, doi:doi:10.1016/j.jiec.2017.08.052, pages 1 - 8, XP085314603 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jiec.2017.08.052 | - "Preparation of latex nanoparticles using nanoemulsion obtained by the phase inversion composition (PIC) method and their application in textile printing, Colloids and Surfaces A: Physicochem", ELGAMMAL M., Eng. Aspects, (20150000), vol. 470, pages 70 - 79 |