EP3617839 - COOLING CHASSIS FOR A COOLING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.07.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.04.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.03.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 31.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.09.2024 [2024/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Quanta Computer Inc. No. 188, Wenhua 2nd Road Guishan District Taoyuan City 33377 / TW | [2020/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Chao-Jung No. 211, Wenhua 2nd Rd., Guishan Dist. 33377 Taoyuan City / TW | 02 /
HUANG, Yu-Nien No. 211, Wenhua 2nd Rd., Guishan Dist. 33377 Taoyuan City / TW | 03 /
CHEN, Ching-Yu No. 211, Wenhua 2nd Rd., Guishan Dist. 33377 Taoyuan City / TW | 04 /
LI, Tsung-Ta No. 211, Wenhua 2nd Rd., Guishan Dist. 33377 Taoyuan City / TW | [2020/10] | Representative(s) | Krauns, Christian Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Zweibrückenstraße 5-7 80331 München / DE | [2020/10] | Application number, filing date | 19185483.5 | 10.07.2019 | [2020/10] | Priority number, date | US201862723755P | 28.08.2018 Original published format: US 201862723755 P | US201916251776 | 18.01.2019 Original published format: US201916251776 | [2020/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3617839 | Date: | 04.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3617839 | Date: | 11.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/20, H05K7/20 | [2020/10] | CPC: |
H05K7/20781 (EP);
G06F1/20 (EP,CN);
H05K7/20727 (US);
F04D25/166 (CN);
G06F1/206 (US);
H05K7/20145 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/15] |
Former [2020/10] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | KÜHLUNGSCHASSIS FÜR EIN KÜHLSYSTEM | [2020/10] | English: | COOLING CHASSIS FOR A COOLING SYSTEM | [2020/10] | French: | CHÂSSIS DE REFROIDISSEMENT POUR SYSTÈME DE REFROIDISSEMENT | [2020/10] | Examination procedure | 02.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/15] | 02.03.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.07.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 20.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 20.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 12.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.10.2023 | CZ | 11.10.2023 | DK | 11.10.2023 | EE | 11.10.2023 | ES | 11.10.2023 | HR | 11.10.2023 | IT | 11.10.2023 | LT | 11.10.2023 | LV | 11.10.2023 | NL | 11.10.2023 | PL | 11.10.2023 | RO | 11.10.2023 | RS | 11.10.2023 | SE | 11.10.2023 | SK | 11.10.2023 | SM | 11.10.2023 | BG | 11.01.2024 | NO | 11.01.2024 | GR | 12.01.2024 | IS | 11.02.2024 | PT | 12.02.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
CZ | 11.10.2023 | ||
DK | 11.10.2023 | ||
EE | 11.10.2023 | ||
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RO | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
DK | 11.10.2023 | ||
EE | 11.10.2023 | ||
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
DK | 11.10.2023 | ||
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 11.10.2023 | |
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | NL | 11.10.2023 | |
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 11.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6512673 (WILEY ROBERT [US]) [Y] 1-14 * column 1, line 27 - column 3, line 10 * * column 3, line 52 - column 5, line 8; figures 1-4 *; | [Y]US2007295492 (SHARP ANTHONY [CA], et al) [Y] 1-14 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0045]; figures 1-5 *; | [Y]US2008017360 (CAMPBELL LEVI A [US], et al) [Y] 1-14 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0053]; figures 2-6 *; | [Y]KR20160086200 (ART CABLE CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 6-11 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0011] ** paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0038]; figures 4b-5b * | Examination | JP2002043490 | US2009120622 |