EP3594954 - FOCUSING LINEAR MODEL CORRECTION AND LINEAR MODEL CORRECTION FOR MULTIVARIATE CALIBRATION MODEL MAINTENANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.10.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.05.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Viavi Solutions Inc. 1445 South Spectrum Blvd, Suite 102 Chandler, AZ 85286 / US | [2022/39] |
Former [2020/03] | For all designated states Viavi Solutions Inc. 6001 America Center Drive San Jose, CA 95002 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUN, Lan 3772 Sherbrook Dr. Santa Rosa, CA 95404 / US | 02 /
HSIUNG, Changmeng 769 Mediterranean Ln. Redwood City, CA 94065 / US | [2020/03] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/03] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 19185599.8 | 10.07.2019 | [2020/03] | Priority number, date | US201816032978 | 11.07.2018 Original published format: US201816032978 | [2020/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3594954 | Date: | 15.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3594954 | Date: | 16.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G16C20/70, G01N21/47 | [2020/51] | CPC: |
G16C20/70 (EP);
G16C20/30 (KR);
G01N21/274 (EP,CN,US);
G01J3/02 (KR);
G01J3/28 (CN);
G06F17/18 (US);
G16C60/00 (KR);
G01N21/359 (EP);
G01N2201/127 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/03] | G16C20/70 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/25] |
Former [2020/03] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FOKUSSIERENDE LINEARE MODELLKORREKTUR UND LINEARE MODELLKORREKTUR ZUR AUFRECHTERHALTUNG MULTIVARIATER KALIBRIERUNGSMODELLE | [2020/03] | English: | FOCUSING LINEAR MODEL CORRECTION AND LINEAR MODEL CORRECTION FOR MULTIVARIATE CALIBRATION MODEL MAINTENANCE | [2020/03] | French: | FOCALISATION DE CORRECTION DE MODÈLES LINÉAIRES ET CORRECTION DE MODÈLES LINÉAIRES POUR MAINTENANCE DE MODÈLES D'ÉTALONNAGE À PLUSIEURS VARIABLES | [2020/03] | Examination procedure | 10.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/25] | 19.05.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5459677 (KOWALSKI BRUCE R [US], et al); |