Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10455947 | Global Dossier | 29.10.2019 | B2 | US2018213941 | 02.08.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102015112618 | 31.07.2015 | WO2016EP66011 | 06.07.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3337353 | Global Dossier | 11.09.2019 | B1 | EP3337353 | 27.06.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102015112618 | 31.07.2015 | WO2016EP66011 | 06.07.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3583867 | Global Dossier | 20.10.2021 | B1 | EP3583867 | 25.12.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP16734720 | 06.07.2016 | DE102015112618 | 31.07.2015 | WO2016EP66011 | 06.07.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK3337353T | 16.12.2019 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE102015112618 | 31.07.2015 | WO2016EP66011 | 06.07.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2759800T | 12.05.2020 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE102015112618 | 31.07.2015 | WO2016EP66011 | 06.07.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL3337353T | 28.02.2020 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP16734720 | 06.07.2016 | DE102015112618 | 31.07.2015 | WO2016EP66011 | 06.07.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017021089 | Global Dossier | 09.02.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102015112618 | 31.07.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102015112618 | 02.02.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102015112618 | 31.07.2015 | Type | Earlier application | EP3337353 |