EP3594934 - DISPLAY PANEL, AND IMAGE DISPLAY APPARATUS INCLUDING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.09.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2023 | Refusal of application | published on 27.12.2023 [2023/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG ELECTRONICS INC. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-Gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2020/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANG, Kyungjin 51, Gasan digital 1-ro, Geumcheon-gu 08592 Seoul / KR | [2020/03] | Representative(s) | Frenkel, Matthias Alexander Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/03] | Katérle, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19186261.4 | 15.07.2019 | [2020/03] | Priority number, date | US201862697764P | 13.07.2018 Original published format: US 201862697764 P | KR20180118934 | 05.10.2018 Original published format: KR 20180118934 | [2020/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3594934 | Date: | 15.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3594934 | Date: | 18.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G09G5/10, G09G3/20 | [2020/03] | CPC: |
G09G3/2003 (EP,CN);
G09G3/20 (CN);
G09G3/2074 (CN);
G09G5/10 (EP);
H04N9/64 (CN);
H04N9/73 (CN);
G09G2300/0452 (EP);
G09G2320/0233 (EP);
G09G2340/06 (EP,CN);
G09G2360/16 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/42] |
Former [2020/03] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANZEIGETAFEL UND BILDANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG DAMIT | [2020/03] | English: | DISPLAY PANEL, AND IMAGE DISPLAY APPARATUS INCLUDING THE SAME | [2020/03] | French: | PANNEAU D'AFFICHAGE ET APPAREIL D'AFFICHAGE D'IMAGES LE COMPRENANT | [2020/03] | Examination procedure | 09.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.09.2020 | Examination requested [2020/42] | 09.09.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.2023 | Date of oral proceedings | 09.08.2023 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 10.08.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2023/52] | 20.08.2023 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2023/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2016163249 (YATA TATSUYA [JP], et al) [X] 1-7,13,14 * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0067] * * paragraph [0076] - paragraph [0096] *; | [XY]US2017352304 (FUNATSU YOHEI [JP]) [X] 1-5,13,14 * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0059] * * paragraph [0081] - paragraph [0147] * [Y] 8-12; | [Y]US2018040284 (KANG KYUNGJIN [KR]) [Y] 8-12* paragraph [0132] - paragraph [0174] * |