EP3581649 - POLYPEPTIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.08.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ultimovacs ASA Ullernchausséen 64 0379 Oslo / NO | [2019/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAUDERNACK, Gustav Oslo University Hospital, Radiumhospitalet Institute for Cancer Research Dept. of Immunology Montebello 0310 Oslo / NO | 02 /
RASMUSSEN, Anne-Marie Oslo University Hospital, Radiumhospitalet Institute for Cancer Research Dept. of Immunology Montebello 0310 Oslo / NO | 03 /
SUSO, Else Marit Inderberg Oslo University Hospital, Radiumhospitalet Institute for Cancer Research Dept. of Immunology Montebello 0310 Oslo / NO | [2019/51] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/51] | Arends, William Gerrit Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | Application number, filing date | 19186391.9 | 15.02.2011 | [2019/51] | Priority number, date | EP20100250265 | 16.02.2010 Original published format: EP 10250265 | [2019/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3581649 | Date: | 18.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/12, A61K38/47, A61K39/00 | [2019/51] | CPC: |
C12N9/1276 (EP,KR,US);
C07K14/47 (KR);
A61K39/001157 (KR,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/4615 (EP,KR);
A61K39/4622 (EP,KR);
A61K39/464457 (EP,KR);
A61P35/00 (EP,KR);
A61P37/04 (EP,KR);
C07K14/435 (KR,US);
C07K7/06 (KR,US);
C07K7/08 (KR,US);
C12Y207/07049 (EP,KR,US);
A61K2039/5154 (KR,US);
A61K2039/53 (EP,KR,US);
A61K2239/50 (EP,KR);
A61K2239/54 (EP,KR);
A61K2239/55 (EP,KR);
A61K2239/57 (EP,KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/51] | Title | German: | POLYPEPTIDE | [2019/51] | English: | POLYPEPTIDES | [2019/51] | French: | POLYPEPTIDES | [2019/51] | Examination procedure | 15.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/51] | 09.07.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 21.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11707345.2 / EP2536830 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 21.09.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 21.09.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.09.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 14.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 03.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 03.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO0002581 (NORSK HYDRO AS [NO], et al); | [A]WO02094312 (GEMVAX AS [NO], et al); | [Y]WO03038047 (BAYLOR COLLEGE MEDICINE [US], et al); | by applicant | WO0002581 | WO02094312 | WO03038047 |