EP3598221 - CAMERA ACCESSORY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.07.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.06.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIKON CORPORATION 15-3, Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-6290 / JP | [2020/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Funaoka, Takayuki c/o NIKON CORPORATION Intellectual Property Division 15-3, Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo, 108-6290 / JP | [2020/04] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2020/04] | Application number, filing date | 19186534.4 | 16.07.2019 | [2020/04] | Priority number, date | JP20180135199 | 18.07.2018 Original published format: JP 2018135199 | [2020/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3598221 | Date: | 22.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G03B7/20, G03B17/02, G03B17/14, G03B17/56 | [2020/04] | CPC: |
G03B17/14 (EP,CN,US);
G03B17/565 (EP);
G03B7/26 (US);
H04N23/54 (CN);
H04N23/55 (CN);
G03B2206/00 (EP);
G03B2217/007 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/31] |
Former [2020/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KEMERAZUBEHÖR | [2020/04] | English: | CAMERA ACCESSORY | [2020/04] | French: | ACCESSOIRE POUR CAMERA | [2020/04] | Examination procedure | 18.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/31] | 19.06.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5060005 (ITOH JUNICHI [JP], et al); | [X]US2013022348 (HASUDA MASANORI [JP], et al); | [A]JP2013080211 (NIKON CORP) | by applicant | JP2004117380 | JP2018135199 |