Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10724403 | Global Dossier | 28.07.2020 | B2 | US2020018185 | 16.01.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201816036513 | 16.07.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3597872 | Global Dossier | 10.11.2021 | B1 | EP3597872 | 22.01.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201816036513 | 16.07.2018 |