EP3767543 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A NEURAL NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.07.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2021/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fischer, Volker Strohgaeustr. 3 71229 Leonberg / DE | 02 /
Khoreva, Anna Reinsburgstr 163 70197 Stuttgart / DE | 03 /
Munoz Delgado, Andres Mauricio Gartenstrasse 35 71263 Weil Der Stadt / DE | 04 /
Hoyer, Lukas Friedhofstrasse 2c 39175 Biederitz / DE | 05 /
Katiyar, Prateek Nauklerstrasse 15 72074 Tuebingen / DE | [2021/03] | Application number, filing date | 19186797.7 | 17.07.2019 | [2021/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3767543 | Date: | 20.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06N3/04 | [2021/03] | CPC: |
G06N3/045 (EP,CN);
G06F18/24 (CN);
G06N3/08 (CN,US);
G06F18/214 (CN);
G06N3/04 (US);
G06T7/11 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/34] |
Former [2021/03] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB EINES NEURONALEN NETZES | [2021/03] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A NEURAL NETWORK | [2021/03] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN RÉSEAU NEURONAL | [2021/03] | Examination procedure | 27.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/34] | 20.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I] - RUTH FONG ET AL, "Interpretable Explanations of Black Boxes by Meaningful Perturbation", ARXIV.ORG, CORNELL UNIVERSITY LIBRARY, 201 OLIN LIBRARY CORNELL UNIVERSITY ITHACA, NY 14853, (20170411), doi:10.1109/ICCV.2017.371, XP081305661 [I] 1-19 * Sections 4.1 and 4.2; figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICCV.2017.371 |