14.06.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] |
03.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] |
14.07.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] |
23.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] |
05.08.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2022 [2022/36] |
29.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.08.2022 [2022/35] |
22.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.08.2022 [2022/34] |
17.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.07.2022 [2022/29] |
27.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] |
13.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.06.2022 [2022/24] |
29.04.2022 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 01.06.2022 [2022/22] |
22.04.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.05.2022 [2022/21] |
02.04.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.05.2022 [2022/18] |
18.02.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.03.2022 [2022/12] |
11.02.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.03.2022 [2022/11] |
28.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.03.2022 [2022/09] |
21.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.02.2022 [2022/08] |
14.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.02.2022 [2022/07] |
19.11.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.12.2021 [2021/51] |
12.11.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.12.2021 [2021/50] |
05.11.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.12.2021 [2021/49] |
23.10.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.11.2021 [2021/47] |
21.10.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.11.2021 [2021/46] |
21.05.2021 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 23.06.2021 [2021/25] |
17.05.2021 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
17.05.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
17.05.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
16.03.2021 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
12.03.2021 |
Change - French title |
published on 14.04.2021 [2021/15] |
03.11.2020 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
30.09.2020 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
25.09.2020 |
First examination report |
|
25.05.2020 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
22.05.2020 |
Change - designated states |
published on 24.06.2020 [2020/26] |
17.01.2020 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08] |
17.01.2020 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08] |
19.07.2019 |
Change - representative |
|