Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10962602 | Global Dossier | 30.03.2021 | B2 | US2020057114 | 20.02.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2018152624 | 14.08.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6858734B | Global Dossier | 14.04.2021 | B2 | JP2020027768 | 20.02.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2018152624 | 14.08.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110829514B | Global Dossier | 20.06.2023 | B | CN110829514 | 21.02.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2018152624 | 14.08.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3611930 | Global Dossier | 23.06.2021 | B1 | EP3611930 | 19.02.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2018152624 | 14.08.2018 |