EP3599532 - A SYSTEM FOR IMPORTING USER INTERFACE DEVICES INTO VIRTUAL/AUGMENTED REALITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.04.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.05.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.01.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.12.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Logitech Europe S.A. EPFL - Quartier de l'Innovation Daniel Borel Innovation Center 1015 Lausanne / CH | [2022/25] |
Former [2020/05] | For all designated states Logitech Europe S.A. EPFl - Quartier de l'Innovation Daniel Borel Innovation Center 1015 Lausanne / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARVEY, Stephen EPFL - Quartier de l'Innovation Daniel Borel Innovation Center 1015 Lausanne / CH | 02 /
O'KEEFFE, Denis EPFL - Quartier de l'Innovation Daniel Borel Innovation Center 1015 Lausanne / CH | 03 /
KEHOE, Aidan EPFL - Quartier de l'Innovation Daniel Borel Innovation Center 1015 Lausanne / CH | 04 /
GUTIERREZ, Mario EPFL - Quartier de l'Innovation Daniel Borel Innovation Center 1015 Lausanne / CH | 05 /
O'SULLIVAN, Damien EPFL - Quartier de l'Innovation Daniel Borel Innovation Center 1015 Lausanne / CH | 06 /
ROUVINEZ, Thomas EPFL - Quartier de l'Innovation Daniel Borel Innovation Center 1015 Lausanne / CH | 07 /
MEISSER, Mathieu EPFL - Quartier de l'Innovation Daniel Borel Innovation Center 1015 Lausanne / CH | 08 /
CURRAN, Noirin EPFL - Quartier de l'Innovation Daniel Borel Innovation Center 1015 Lausanne / CH | 09 /
ZIMMERMANN, Remy EPFL - Quartier de l'Innovation Daniel Borel Innovation Center 1015 Lausanne / CH | 10 /
TWOHIG, Marcel EPFL - Quartier de l'Innovation Daniel Borel Innovation Center 1015 Lausanne / CH | 11 /
ONORIO, Dennin EPFL - Quartier de l'Innovation Daniel Borel Innovation Center 1015 Lausanne / CH | 12 /
O'BRADAIGH, Pierce EPFL - Quartier de l'Innovation Daniel Borel Innovation Center 1015 Lausanne / CH | 13 /
RIVIERE, Olivier EPFL - Quartier de l'Innovation Daniel Borel Innovation Center 1015 Lausanne / CH | 14 /
TROTMAN, Ciaran EPFL - Quartier de l'Innovation Daniel Borel Innovation Center 1015 Lausanne / CH | 15 /
CONNELLAN, Andreas EPFL - Quartier de l'Innovation Daniel Borel Innovation Center 1015 Lausanne / CH | 16 /
MURPHY, Padraig EPFL - Quartier de l'Innovation Daniel Borel Innovation Center 1015 Lausanne / CH | 17 /
AHERN, Jerry EPFL - Quartier de l'Innovation Daniel Borel Innovation Center 1015 Lausanne / CH | [2022/25] |
Former [2020/05] | 01 /
HARVEY, Stephan EPFL - Quartier de l'Innovation Daniel Borel Innovation Center 1015 Lausanne / CH | ||
02 /
O'KEEFFE, Denis EPFL - Quartier de l'Innovation Daniel Borel Innovation Center 1015 Lausanne / CH | |||
03 /
KEHOE, Aidan EPFL - Quartier de l'Innovation Daniel Borel Innovation Center 1015 Lausanne / CH | |||
04 /
GUTIERREZ, Mario EPFL - Quartier de l'Innovation Daniel Borel Innovation Center 1015 Lausanne / CH | |||
05 /
RIVIERE, Olivier EPFL - Quartier de l'Innovation Daniel Borel Innovation Center 1015 Lausanne / CH | |||
06 /
ROUVINEZ, Thomas EPFL - Quartier de l'Innovation Daniel Borel Innovation Center 1015 Lausanne / CH | |||
07 /
MEISSER, Mathieu EPFL - Quartier de l'Innovation Daniel Borel Innovation Center 1015 Lausanne / CH | |||
08 /
CURRAN, Noirin EPFL - Quartier de l'Innovation Daniel Borel Innovation Center 1015 Lausanne / CH | |||
09 /
ZIMMERMANN, Remy EPFL - Quartier de l'Innovation Daniel Borel Innovation Center 1015 Lausanne / CH | |||
10 /
TWOHIG, Marcel EPFL - Quartier de l'Innovation Daniel Borel Innovation Center 1015 Lausanne / CH | |||
11 /
ONORIO, Dennin EPFL - Quartier de l'Innovation Daniel Borel Innovation Center 1015 Lausanne / CH | |||
12 /
O'BRADAIGH, Pierce EPFL - Quartier de l'Innovation Daniel Borel Innovation Center 1015 Lausanne / CH | |||
13 /
RIVIERE, Oliver EPFL - Quartier de l'Innovation Daniel Borel Innovation Center 1015 Lausanne / CH | |||
14 /
TROTMAN, Ciaran EPFL - Quartier de l'Innovation Daniel Borel Innovation Center 1015 Lausanne / CH | |||
15 /
CONNELLAN, Andreas EPFL - Quartier de l'Innovation Daniel Borel Innovation Center 1015 Lausanne / CH | |||
16 /
MURPHY, Padraig EPFL - Quartier de l'Innovation Daniel Borel Innovation Center 1015 Lausanne / CH | |||
17 /
AHERN, Jerry EPFL - Quartier de l'Innovation Daniel Borel Innovation Center 1015 Lausanne / CH | Representative(s) | Hofstetter, Schurack & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei PartG mbB Balanstrasse 57 81541 München / DE | [2020/05] | Application number, filing date | 19187087.2 | 14.11.2017 | [2020/05] | Priority number, date | US201662421910P | 14.11.2016 Original published format: US 201662421910 P | [2020/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3599532 | Date: | 29.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3599532 | Date: | 17.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3599532 | Date: | 22.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/16, G06F3/01, G06F3/042, G06F9/451, G06F11/07, G06T19/00, G09G3/00, G09G5/14, G02B27/01, G06F3/147, G09G5/00, G06F3/0487 | [2020/05] | CPC: |
G06F3/017 (EP);
G02B27/017 (EP);
G06F1/1673 (EP);
G06F3/011 (EP);
G06F3/0426 (EP);
G06F3/0487 (EP);
G06F3/147 (EP);
G06F9/451 (EP);
G06F9/453 (EP);
G06T19/006 (EP);
G09G5/003 (EP);
G02B2027/0138 (EP);
G02B2027/014 (EP);
G02B2027/0187 (EP);
G09G2340/0492 (EP);
G09G2340/12 (EP);
G09G2354/00 (EP);
G09G2360/14 (EP);
G09G5/14 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/03] |
Former [2020/05] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUM IMPORTIEREN VON BENUTZERSCHNITTSTELLENVORRICHTUNGEN IN EINE VIRTUELLE/ERWEITERTE REALITÄT | [2020/05] | English: | A SYSTEM FOR IMPORTING USER INTERFACE DEVICES INTO VIRTUAL/AUGMENTED REALITY | [2020/05] | French: | SYSTÈME D'IMPORTATION DE DISPOSITIFS D'INTERFACE UTILISATEUR EN RÉALITÉ VIRTUELLE/AUGMENTÉE | [2020/05] | Examination procedure | 16.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/03] | 16.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.01.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.05.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17868922.0 / EP3539087 | Opposition(s) | 23.03.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.11.2017 | AL | 22.06.2022 | AT | 22.06.2022 | CY | 22.06.2022 | CZ | 22.06.2022 | DK | 22.06.2022 | EE | 22.06.2022 | ES | 22.06.2022 | FI | 22.06.2022 | HR | 22.06.2022 | IT | 22.06.2022 | LT | 22.06.2022 | LV | 22.06.2022 | MC | 22.06.2022 | MK | 22.06.2022 | MT | 22.06.2022 | NL | 22.06.2022 | PL | 22.06.2022 | RO | 22.06.2022 | RS | 22.06.2022 | SE | 22.06.2022 | SI | 22.06.2022 | SK | 22.06.2022 | SM | 22.06.2022 | BG | 22.09.2022 | NO | 22.09.2022 | GR | 23.09.2022 | IS | 22.10.2022 | PT | 24.10.2022 | GB | 14.11.2022 | IE | 14.11.2022 | LU | 14.11.2022 | BE | 30.11.2022 | CH | 30.11.2022 | FR | 30.11.2022 | LI | 30.11.2022 | [2024/44] |
Former [2024/27] | HU | 14.11.2017 | |
AL | 22.06.2022 | ||
AT | 22.06.2022 | ||
CY | 22.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2022 | ||
DK | 22.06.2022 | ||
EE | 22.06.2022 | ||
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
IT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
MC | 22.06.2022 | ||
MK | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
PL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RO | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
SI | 22.06.2022 | ||
SK | 22.06.2022 | ||
SM | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
IS | 22.10.2022 | ||
PT | 24.10.2022 | ||
GB | 14.11.2022 | ||
IE | 14.11.2022 | ||
LU | 14.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
FR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 14.11.2017 | |
AL | 22.06.2022 | ||
AT | 22.06.2022 | ||
CY | 22.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2022 | ||
DK | 22.06.2022 | ||
EE | 22.06.2022 | ||
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
IT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
MC | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
PL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RO | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
SI | 22.06.2022 | ||
SK | 22.06.2022 | ||
SM | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
IS | 22.10.2022 | ||
PT | 24.10.2022 | ||
GB | 14.11.2022 | ||
IE | 14.11.2022 | ||
LU | 14.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
FR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 14.11.2017 | |
AL | 22.06.2022 | ||
AT | 22.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2022 | ||
DK | 22.06.2022 | ||
EE | 22.06.2022 | ||
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
IT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
MC | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
PL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RO | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
SI | 22.06.2022 | ||
SK | 22.06.2022 | ||
SM | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
IS | 22.10.2022 | ||
PT | 24.10.2022 | ||
GB | 14.11.2022 | ||
IE | 14.11.2022 | ||
LU | 14.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
FR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AL | 22.06.2022 | |
AT | 22.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2022 | ||
DK | 22.06.2022 | ||
EE | 22.06.2022 | ||
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
IT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
MC | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
PL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RO | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
SI | 22.06.2022 | ||
SK | 22.06.2022 | ||
SM | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
IS | 22.10.2022 | ||
PT | 24.10.2022 | ||
GB | 14.11.2022 | ||
IE | 14.11.2022 | ||
LU | 14.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
FR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/52] | AL | 22.06.2022 | |
AT | 22.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2022 | ||
DK | 22.06.2022 | ||
EE | 22.06.2022 | ||
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
MC | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
PL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RO | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
SI | 22.06.2022 | ||
SK | 22.06.2022 | ||
SM | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
IS | 22.10.2022 | ||
PT | 24.10.2022 | ||
GB | 14.11.2022 | ||
IE | 14.11.2022 | ||
LU | 14.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
FR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 22.06.2022 | |
AT | 22.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2022 | ||
DK | 22.06.2022 | ||
EE | 22.06.2022 | ||
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
MC | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
PL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RO | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
SI | 22.06.2022 | ||
SK | 22.06.2022 | ||
SM | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
IS | 22.10.2022 | ||
PT | 24.10.2022 | ||
GB | 14.11.2022 | ||
IE | 14.11.2022 | ||
LU | 14.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 22.06.2022 | |
AT | 22.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2022 | ||
DK | 22.06.2022 | ||
EE | 22.06.2022 | ||
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
MC | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
PL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RO | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
SI | 22.06.2022 | ||
SK | 22.06.2022 | ||
SM | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
IS | 22.10.2022 | ||
PT | 24.10.2022 | ||
GB | 14.11.2022 | ||
IE | 14.11.2022 | ||
LU | 14.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/47] | AL | 22.06.2022 | |
AT | 22.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2022 | ||
DK | 22.06.2022 | ||
EE | 22.06.2022 | ||
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
MC | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
PL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RO | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
SI | 22.06.2022 | ||
SK | 22.06.2022 | ||
SM | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
IS | 22.10.2022 | ||
PT | 24.10.2022 | ||
GB | 14.11.2022 | ||
LU | 14.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 22.06.2022 | |
AT | 22.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2022 | ||
DK | 22.06.2022 | ||
EE | 22.06.2022 | ||
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
MC | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
PL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RO | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
SI | 22.06.2022 | ||
SK | 22.06.2022 | ||
SM | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
IS | 22.10.2022 | ||
PT | 24.10.2022 | ||
LU | 14.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 22.06.2022 | |
AT | 22.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2022 | ||
DK | 22.06.2022 | ||
EE | 22.06.2022 | ||
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
MC | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
PL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RO | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
SK | 22.06.2022 | ||
SM | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
IS | 22.10.2022 | ||
PT | 24.10.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/31] | AL | 22.06.2022 | |
AT | 22.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2022 | ||
DK | 22.06.2022 | ||
EE | 22.06.2022 | ||
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
MC | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
PL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RO | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
SK | 22.06.2022 | ||
SM | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
IS | 22.10.2022 | ||
PT | 24.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 22.06.2022 | |
AT | 22.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2022 | ||
DK | 22.06.2022 | ||
EE | 22.06.2022 | ||
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
PL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RO | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
SK | 22.06.2022 | ||
SM | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
IS | 22.10.2022 | ||
PT | 24.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 22.06.2022 | |
AT | 22.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2022 | ||
EE | 22.06.2022 | ||
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
PL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RO | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
SK | 22.06.2022 | ||
SM | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
IS | 22.10.2022 | ||
PT | 24.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | AT | 22.06.2022 | |
CZ | 22.06.2022 | ||
EE | 22.06.2022 | ||
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
PL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RO | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
SK | 22.06.2022 | ||
SM | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
IS | 22.10.2022 | ||
PT | 24.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | AT | 22.06.2022 | |
CZ | 22.06.2022 | ||
EE | 22.06.2022 | ||
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
PL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RO | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
SK | 22.06.2022 | ||
SM | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
PT | 24.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 22.06.2022 | |
CZ | 22.06.2022 | ||
EE | 22.06.2022 | ||
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RO | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
SK | 22.06.2022 | ||
SM | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
PT | 24.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AT | 22.06.2022 | |
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 22.06.2022 | |
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/02] | FI | 22.06.2022 | |
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | FI | 22.06.2022 | |
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | FI | 22.06.2022 | |
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | FI | 22.06.2022 | |
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2013342564 (KINNEBREW PETER TOBIAS [US], et al) [A] 1-6,12-15 * paragraphs [0069] - [0090] - [0103] , [0106] , [0107] *; | [A]WO2015096145 (INTEL CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-6,12-15 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2015183621 (SONY COMP ENTERTAINMENT US [US]) [X] 1-4,12-15 * paragraphs [0049] , [0 50] * * figures 2,3 *; | [I]US2016054791 (MULLINS BRIAN [US], et al) [I] 7-11* paragraphs [0036] - [0038] - [0041] , [0042] , [0052] , [0055] - [0058] - [0073] , [0077] , [0083] *; | [X]GB2535730 (BAE SYSTEMS PLC [GB]) [X] 1-6,12-15 * the whole document * |