EP3586868 - LIVER-SPECIFIC NUCLEIC ACID REGULATORY ELEMENTS AND METHODS AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.09.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.10.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VIB VZW Suzanne Tassierstraat 1 9052 Gent / BE | For all designated states Life Sciences Research Partners VZW Herestraat 49, bus 913 3000 Leuven / BE | For all designated states Universiteit Gent Sint-Pietersnieuwstraat 25 9000 Gent / BE | [2024/07] |
Former [2021/03] | For all designated states VIB VZW Rijvisschestraat 120 9052 Gent / BE | ||
For all designated states Life Sciences Research Partners VZW Herestraat 49, bus 913 3000 Leuven / BE | |||
For all designated states Universiteit Gent Sint-Pietersnieuwstraat 25 9000 Gent / BE | |||
Former [2020/01] | For all designated states VIB VZW Rijvisschestraat 120 9052 Gent / BE | ||
For all designated states Life Sciences Research Partners VZW Herestraat 49, bus 913 3000 Leuven / BE | |||
For all designated states Universiteit Gent Sint-Pietersnieuwstraat 25 9000 Gent / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHUAH, Marinee Tiensesteenweg 250 3360 Lovenjoel / BE | 02 /
VANDENDRIESSCHE, Thierry Tiensesteenweg 250 3360 Lovenjoel / BE | 03 /
DE BLESER, Pieter Prosper Bosteelsstraat 18 9255 BUGGENHOUT / BE | [2020/01] | Representative(s) | De Clercq & Partners Edgard Gevaertdreef 10a 9830 Sint-Martens-Latem / BE | [2020/01] | Application number, filing date | 19187191.2 | 21.04.2009 | [2020/01] | Priority number, date | US20080125181P | 22.04.2008 Original published format: US 125181 P | [2020/01] | Previously filed application, date | WO2009EP54724 | 21.04.2009 | [2020/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3586868 | Date: | 01.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3586868 | Date: | 26.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3586868 | Date: | 08.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61P7/04, A61K38/36, A61K48/00, C12N9/64, A61K38/48, C12N15/85, C12N15/52, C12N15/864, C07K14/81, C07K14/755 | [2022/44] | CPC: |
A61K38/4846 (EP,US);
A61K48/0058 (US);
A61P7/04 (EP);
C07K14/8121 (EP,US);
C12N15/52 (EP,US);
C12N15/63 (US);
C12N15/85 (EP,US);
C12N15/86 (US);
C12N9/644 (EP,US);
C12Y304/21022 (EP,US);
A61K48/00 (EP,US);
C12N2750/14143 (US);
C12N2799/025 (EP,US);
C12N2799/027 (EP,US);
C12N2830/008 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2020/01] | A61K38/36, A61K48/00, C07K14/755, C07K14/81, C12N15/864, C12N15/52, C12N15/85, A61K38/48, C12N9/64 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2020/01] | Title | German: | LEBERSPEZIFISCHE NUKLEINSÄUREREGULATORISCHE ELEMENTE SOWIE VERFAHREN UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2020/01] | English: | LIVER-SPECIFIC NUCLEIC ACID REGULATORY ELEMENTS AND METHODS AND USE THEREOF | [2020/01] | French: | ÉLÉMENTS RÉGULATEURS D'ACIDES NUCLÉIQUES SPÉCIFIQUES AU FOIE ET PROCÉDÉS ET LEUR UTILISATION | [2020/01] | Examination procedure | 19.07.2019 | Examination requested [2020/01] | 26.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 03.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09735371.8 / EP2282764 | Divisional application(s) | EP22194189.1 / EP4154903 | Opposition(s) | 09.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 19.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 29.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 25.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 25.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.11.2023 | CZ | 08.11.2023 | DK | 08.11.2023 | EE | 08.11.2023 | ES | 08.11.2023 | HR | 08.11.2023 | IT | 08.11.2023 | LT | 08.11.2023 | LV | 08.11.2023 | NL | 08.11.2023 | PL | 08.11.2023 | RO | 08.11.2023 | SE | 08.11.2023 | SK | 08.11.2023 | BG | 08.02.2024 | NO | 08.02.2024 | GR | 09.02.2024 | IS | 08.03.2024 | PT | 08.03.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
CZ | 08.11.2023 | ||
DK | 08.11.2023 | ||
EE | 08.11.2023 | ||
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
HR | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
LV | 08.11.2023 | ||
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
PL | 08.11.2023 | ||
RO | 08.11.2023 | ||
SE | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
NO | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
DK | 08.11.2023 | ||
EE | 08.11.2023 | ||
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
HR | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
LV | 08.11.2023 | ||
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
PL | 08.11.2023 | ||
SE | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
NO | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
DK | 08.11.2023 | ||
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
HR | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
LV | 08.11.2023 | ||
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
PL | 08.11.2023 | ||
SE | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
NO | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
HR | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
LV | 08.11.2023 | ||
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
PL | 08.11.2023 | ||
SE | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
NO | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
HR | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
PL | 08.11.2023 | ||
SE | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
NO | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 08.11.2023 | |
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 09.02.2024 | |
IS | 08.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XDA]WO0198482 (UNIV LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR [US], et al); | [XA]US2006189561 (ROELVINK PETRUS W [US], et al); | by applicant | WO9511308 | WO0198482 |