EP3599756 - SLIDE RAIL AND MOBILE TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.07.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.07.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.05.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beijing Xiaomi Mobile Software Co., Ltd. Room 01, Floor 9 Rainbow City Shopping Mall II of China Resources No. 68, Qinghe Middle Street, Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2020/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUO, Tianbiao Beijing Xiaomi Mobile Software Co., Ltd. Room 01, Floor 9, Rainbow City Shopping Mall II of China Resources, No. 68, Qinghe Middle Street Haidian District Beijing, 100085 / CN | [2020/05] | Representative(s) | Hughes, Andrea Michelle, et al Dehns Germany Theresienstraße 6-8 80333 München / DE | [2021/35] |
Former [2020/05] | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Dehns Germany Theresienstraße 6-8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19187643.2 | 22.07.2019 | [2020/05] | Priority number, date | CN201810843442 | 27.07.2018 Original published format: CN201810843442 | [2020/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3599756 | Date: | 29.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3599756 | Date: | 01.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/02 | [2020/05] | CPC: |
H04M1/0237 (EP,KR,US);
H04M1/026 (CN);
H04M1/0266 (US);
H04M2201/08 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/25] |
Former [2020/05] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | GLEITSCHIENE UND MOBILES ENDGERÄT | [2020/05] | English: | SLIDE RAIL AND MOBILE TERMINAL | [2020/05] | French: | RAIL COULISSANT ET TERMINAL MOBILE | [2020/05] | Examination procedure | 11.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/25] | 11.05.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.04.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.07.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.06.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.07.2019 | AL | 01.09.2021 | AT | 01.09.2021 | CY | 01.09.2021 | CZ | 01.09.2021 | DK | 01.09.2021 | EE | 01.09.2021 | ES | 01.09.2021 | FI | 01.09.2021 | HR | 01.09.2021 | IT | 01.09.2021 | LT | 01.09.2021 | LV | 01.09.2021 | MC | 01.09.2021 | MK | 01.09.2021 | MT | 01.09.2021 | NL | 01.09.2021 | PL | 01.09.2021 | RO | 01.09.2021 | RS | 01.09.2021 | SE | 01.09.2021 | SI | 01.09.2021 | SK | 01.09.2021 | SM | 01.09.2021 | TR | 01.09.2021 | BG | 01.12.2021 | NO | 01.12.2021 | GR | 02.12.2021 | IS | 01.01.2022 | PT | 03.01.2022 | [2024/44] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 22.07.2019 | |
AL | 01.09.2021 | ||
AT | 01.09.2021 | ||
CY | 01.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
DK | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
IT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
MC | 01.09.2021 | ||
MK | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SI | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
TR | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2024/23] | HU | 22.07.2019 | |
AL | 01.09.2021 | ||
AT | 01.09.2021 | ||
CY | 01.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
DK | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
IT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
MC | 01.09.2021 | ||
MK | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SI | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 22.07.2019 | |
AL | 01.09.2021 | ||
AT | 01.09.2021 | ||
CY | 01.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
DK | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
IT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
MC | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SI | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 22.07.2019 | |
AL | 01.09.2021 | ||
AT | 01.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
DK | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
IT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
MC | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SI | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | AL | 01.09.2021 | |
AT | 01.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
DK | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
IT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
MC | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SI | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 01.09.2021 | |
AT | 01.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
DK | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
IT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SI | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 01.09.2021 | |
AT | 01.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 01.09.2021 | |
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 01.09.2021 | |
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 01.09.2021 | |
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | ES | 01.09.2021 | |
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | ES | 01.09.2021 | |
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | ES | 01.09.2021 | |
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | LT | 01.09.2021 | |
NO | 01.12.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1639720 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 2 * paragraph [0035] * * figure 9 *; | [XYI]EP1926289 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1,3,8,12,14,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0022] - [0036] * * figures 3,3A,5,6 * [Y] 2,4,5,7 [I] 6,9-11,13; | [Y]KR100833945B (SAMSUNG TECHWIN CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 4,5,7 * abstract ** figures 2,3,8 * |