EP3576490 - REMOTE UNIT FOR COMMUNICATING WITH BASE STATIONS AND TERMINAL DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.05.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CommScope Technologies LLC 1100 CommScope Place SE Hickory, NC 28602 / US | [2019/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUMMETZ, Thomas Oberes Sandfeld 17 86477 Adelsried / DE | 02 /
HANSON, Van E. 106 Brook Ridge Place Forest, VA Virginia 24551 / US | 03 /
WILLIAMSON, Michael 729 Parkridge Drive Clayton, VA Virginia 27527 / US | [2019/49] | Representative(s) | Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | [2019/49] | Application number, filing date | 19187753.9 | 14.03.2014 | [2019/49] | Priority number, date | US201361790515P | 15.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361790515 P | [2019/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3576490 | Date: | 04.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3576490 | Date: | 18.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04W88/08, H04B1/525, H04B7/024, H04L5/14, H04W28/04, H04W72/12 | [2019/49] | CPC: |
H04W88/085 (EP,US);
H04B1/525 (US);
H04B1/40 (US);
H04B7/024 (US);
H04L5/14 (US);
H04W28/04 (US);
H04W72/1273 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/26] |
Former [2019/49] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | FERNGERÄT ZUR KOMMUNIKATION MIT BASISSTATIONEN UND TERMINALGERÄTEN | [2021/40] | English: | REMOTE UNIT FOR COMMUNICATING WITH BASE STATIONS AND TERMINAL DEVICES | [2019/49] | French: | UNITÉ À DISTANCE POUR COMMUNIQUER AVEC DES STATIONS DE BASE ET DES DISPOSITIFS TERMINAUX | [2021/40] |
Former [2019/49] | ENTFERNTE EINHEIT ZUR KOMMUNIKATION MIT BASISSTATIONEN UND ENDGERÄTEVORRICHTUNGEN | ||
Former [2019/49] | UNITÉ DISTANTE POUR COMMUNIQUER AVEC DES STATIONS DE BASE ET DES APPAREILS TERMINAUX | Examination procedure | 20.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/26] | 20.05.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14764640.0 / EP2974070 | Opposition(s) | 19.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.10.2023 | CZ | 18.10.2023 | DK | 18.10.2023 | EE | 18.10.2023 | ES | 18.10.2023 | HR | 18.10.2023 | IT | 18.10.2023 | LT | 18.10.2023 | LV | 18.10.2023 | NL | 18.10.2023 | PL | 18.10.2023 | RO | 18.10.2023 | RS | 18.10.2023 | SE | 18.10.2023 | SK | 18.10.2023 | SM | 18.10.2023 | BG | 18.01.2024 | NO | 18.01.2024 | GR | 19.01.2024 | IS | 18.02.2024 | PT | 19.02.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 18.10.2023 | |
CZ | 18.10.2023 | ||
DK | 18.10.2023 | ||
EE | 18.10.2023 | ||
ES | 18.10.2023 | ||
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
LV | 18.10.2023 | ||
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RO | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SE | 18.10.2023 | ||
SM | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
PT | 19.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 18.10.2023 | |
DK | 18.10.2023 | ||
EE | 18.10.2023 | ||
ES | 18.10.2023 | ||
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
LV | 18.10.2023 | ||
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SE | 18.10.2023 | ||
SM | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
PT | 19.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 18.10.2023 | |
DK | 18.10.2023 | ||
ES | 18.10.2023 | ||
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
LV | 18.10.2023 | ||
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SE | 18.10.2023 | ||
SM | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
PT | 19.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 18.10.2023 | |
ES | 18.10.2023 | ||
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
LV | 18.10.2023 | ||
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SE | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
PT | 19.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 18.10.2023 | |
ES | 18.10.2023 | ||
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SE | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
PT | 19.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 18.10.2023 | |
ES | 18.10.2023 | ||
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
PT | 19.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 18.10.2023 | |
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | NL | 18.10.2023 | |
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 18.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1227605 (LGC WIRELESS INC [US]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] - [0005] - [0008] , [0032] , [0035] , [0046] , [0048] , [0049] * * figure 1 *; | [A]US6771933 (ENG JIM [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * column 1, lines 14-54 * * column 2, lines 23-39 * * column 4, lines 37-60 * * column 5, lines 3-39 * * column 5, line 59 - column 6, line 41 * * column 8, lines 14-30 * * figures 1,2; claims 1-7 *; | [A]US2010278530 (KUMMETZ THOMAS [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0056] , [0057] ** figure 8; claims 1-3 *; | [A]US2011243201 (PHILLIPS FRED WILLIAM [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] , [0005] , [0009] , [0016] * * claims 6,7,22,28 *; | [A]WO2012173443 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2013012225 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | US2014128089 [ ] (JANG JIWOONG [KR], et al) [ ] * abstract * * paragraphs [0035] - [0038] * * figure 1 *; | EP2733988 [ ] (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [ ] * abstract * * paragraphs [0030] , [0033] * | Examination | WO2013032259 | EP2753122 |