EP3594326 - METHOD FOR SEPARATING CELLS USING IMMUNOROSETTES AND PARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.09.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.10.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.09.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.07.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stemcell Technologies Inc. 570 West Seventh Avenue Suite 400 Vancouver, British Columbia V5Z 1B3 / CA | [2020/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOKAJI, Andy Isamu 583 West 7th Avenue Vancouver, British Columbia V5Z 1B4 / CA | [2020/03] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [2023/46] |
Former [2020/03] | HGF Limited 4th Floor Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | Application number, filing date | 19188209.1 | 12.03.2014 | [2020/03] | Priority number, date | US201361788907P | 15.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361788907 P | US201461929674P | 21.01.2014 Original published format: US 201461929674 P | [2020/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3594326 | Date: | 15.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3594326 | Date: | 15.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/078, C12N5/0783, G01N33/53, C07K16/28 | [2020/03] | CPC: |
C07K16/28 (EP,US);
C07K16/4283 (EP,US);
A23L2/52 (EP);
A61K31/07 (EP);
A61K31/122 (EP);
A61K31/197 (EP);
A61K31/198 (EP);
A61K31/221 (EP);
A61K31/355 (EP);
A61K31/375 (EP);
A61K31/385 (EP);
A61K31/4188 (EP);
A61K31/4415 (EP);
A61K31/455 (EP);
A61K31/51 (EP);
A61K31/519 (EP);
A61K31/525 (EP);
A61K31/593 (EP);
A61K31/714 (EP);
A61K33/00 (EP);
A61K33/04 (EP);
A61K33/06 (EP);
A61K33/30 (EP);
C07K16/2896 (EP,US);
G01N1/40 (US);
G01N33/56966 (US);
G01N33/56972 (US);
A23L33/10 (EP);
A23L33/105 (EP);
A23L33/12 (EP);
A23L33/15 (EP);
A23L33/155 (EP);
A23L33/16 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/07, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/197, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/198, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/221, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/355, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/375, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/385, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/4188, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/4415, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/455, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/519, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/51, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/525, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/714, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K33/00, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K33/04, A61K2300/00 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/34] |
Former [2020/03] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ZELLSEPARATION UNTER VERWENDUNG VON IMMUNOROSETTEN UND TEILCHEN | [2020/03] | English: | METHOD FOR SEPARATING CELLS USING IMMUNOROSETTES AND PARTICLES | [2020/03] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE SÉPARATION DE CELLULES À L'AIDE DE ROSETTES IMMUNES ET DE PARTICULES | [2020/03] | Examination procedure | 15.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/34] | 15.07.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14764294.6 / EP2970906 | Opposition(s) | 19.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 09.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.11.2023 | CZ | 15.11.2023 | DK | 15.11.2023 | EE | 15.11.2023 | ES | 15.11.2023 | HR | 15.11.2023 | IT | 15.11.2023 | LT | 15.11.2023 | LV | 15.11.2023 | PL | 15.11.2023 | RO | 15.11.2023 | RS | 15.11.2023 | SK | 15.11.2023 | SM | 15.11.2023 | BG | 15.02.2024 | NO | 15.02.2024 | GR | 16.02.2024 | IS | 15.03.2024 | PT | 15.03.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
CZ | 15.11.2023 | ||
DK | 15.11.2023 | ||
EE | 15.11.2023 | ||
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RO | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SM | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
DK | 15.11.2023 | ||
EE | 15.11.2023 | ||
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SM | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
DK | 15.11.2023 | ||
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SM | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 15.11.2023 | |
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 16.02.2024 | |
IS | 15.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]CA2725132 (STEMCELL TECHNOLOGIES INC [CA]); | [Y]US2006024824 (WOODSIDE STEVEN [CA], et al); | by applicant | US4752582 | US4868109 | US6448075 | WO2012EP73083 |