EP3608170 - VEHICULAR ILLUMINATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.04.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.08.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.06.2021 [2021/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi Fuchu-cho Aki-gun, Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | [2020/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakaya, Yoshiaki c/o Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi, Fuchu-cho, Aki-gun Hiroshima, 730-8670 / JP | [2020/07] | Representative(s) | Laufhütte, Dieter Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 23 80538 München / DE | [2020/07] | Application number, filing date | 19188281.0 | 25.07.2019 | [2020/07] | Priority number, date | JP20180147453 | 06.08.2018 Original published format: JP 2018147453 | JP20180147456 | 06.08.2018 Original published format: JP 2018147456 | [2020/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3608170 | Date: | 12.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B60Q1/00, F21S43/237, F21S43/241, F21S43/243, F21S43/245, F21S43/247, F21S43/251 | [2020/07] | CPC: |
B60Q1/0052 (EP);
F21S41/24 (CN,US);
B60Q1/0041 (EP);
F21S41/141 (US);
F21S41/28 (US);
F21S41/33 (US);
F21S43/237 (EP);
F21S43/241 (EP);
F21S43/243 (EP);
F21S43/245 (EP);
F21S43/247 (EP);
F21S43/251 (EP);
B60Q2400/30 (EP);
F21W2102/00 (CN);
F21W2103/55 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGBELEUCHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2020/07] | English: | VEHICULAR ILLUMINATION DEVICE | [2020/07] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ÉCLAIRAGE VÉHICULAIRE | [2020/07] | Examination procedure | 06.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/38] | 06.08.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/22] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JP2015133219 (KOITO MFG CO LTD) [X] 1-4,11 * see attached machine translation; paragraphs [0025] - [0086]; figures 1-5 * [Y] 5-10; | [Y]US2010202153 (SCHWAB LEO F [US]) [Y] 5 * figures 1-3 *; | [Y]DE102013017859 (DAIMLER AG [DE]) [Y] 6-10 * paragraphs [0001] , [0007] - [0011] - [0013] , [0014] , [0016] , [0018] , [0019] , [0032] - [0034]; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]EP2839989 (TYC BROTHER IND CO LTD [TW]) [Y] 7-10 * paragraphs [0001] , [0009] , [0011] , [0012]; figures 1-3 *; | [XY]US9651212 (WASILEWSKI ANDRZEJ [US], et al) [X] 1,11 * column 2, line 10 - column 6, line 16; figures 1-4 * [Y] 2-10; | [Y]US2016102834 (YAMADA AKIRA [JP], et al) [Y] 5 * figures 1-6 *; | [Y]JP2016091846 (KOITO MFG CO LTD) [Y] 6-10 * see attached machine translation; paragraphs [0014] - [0046]; figures 1-8 *; | [Y]EP3252368 (VALEO ILUMINACION SA [ES]) [Y] 2-4,7-10 * paragraphs [0001] , [0011] - [0056]; figures 1-6 *; | [A]EP2624027 (HELLA LIGHTING FINLAND OY [FI]) [A] 1,2,6-8 * the whole document *; | [A]EP3098500 (VALEO VISION BELGIQUE [BE]) [A] 1,6-8 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2014164975 (STANLEY ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1,2,6-8 * see attached machine translation;; figures 1-4 * | by applicant | JP2018032512 | JP2018147453 | JP2018147456 |