EP3617058 - A WING SYSTEM FOR AN AIRCRAFT WITH A FLOW BODY AND A COVER PANEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.01.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 31.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.02.2021 [2021/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Airbus Operations GmbH Kreetslag 10 21129 Hamburg / DE | [2020/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gibbert, Markus c/o Airbus Operations GmbH Kreetslag 10 21129 Hamburg / DE | 02 /
Lorenz, Florian c/o Airbus Operations GmbH Kreetslag 10 21129 Hamburg / DE | [2020/10] | Representative(s) | LKGLOBAL Lorenz & Kopf Patentanwalt Attorney at Law PartG mbB Brienner Straße 11 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/10] | LKGLOBAL Lorenz & Kopf PartG mbB Patentanwälte Brienner Straße 11 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19188512.8 | 26.07.2019 | [2020/10] | Priority number, date | DE201810121182 | 30.08.2018 Original published format: DE102018121182 | [2020/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3617058 | Date: | 04.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B64C9/04, B64C9/12, B64C9/16 | [2020/10] | CPC: |
B64C9/04 (EP);
B64C3/50 (CN);
B64C9/12 (EP,US);
B64C9/02 (US);
B64C9/16 (EP,CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLÜGELSYSTEM FÜR EIN FLUGZEUG MIT EINEM STRÖMUNGSKÖRPER UND EINER ABDECKPLATTE | [2020/10] | English: | A WING SYSTEM FOR AN AIRCRAFT WITH A FLOW BODY AND A COVER PANEL | [2020/10] | French: | SYSTÈME D'AILE POUR AÉRONEF COMPORTANT UN CORPS D'ÉCOULEMENT ET UN PANNEAU DE COUVERTURE | [2020/10] | Examination procedure | 05.09.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/07] | 28.09.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/07] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2556326 (GRANT CHARLES H) [X] 1,2,4-8,11-15 * column 2, line 29 - column 5, line 7 * * figures 1-5 * [A] 9 [I] 3; | [XAI]US2772058 (GRANT CHARLES H) [X] 1,2,4-8,10,12,15 * column 3, line 29 - column 7, line 71 * * figures 1-14 * [A] 9 [I] 3,13,14; | [XAI]EP1787905 (BOEING CO [US]) [X] 1-8,14,15 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0034] * * figures 1A-6C * [A] 9 [I] 10,13; | [A]US7243881 (SAKURAI SEIYA [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 2, line 60 - column 11, line 24 * * figures 1-8C *; | [A]US2007176051 (GOOD MARK S [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0002] - [0005] ** figures 1, 2 *; | [A]EP2669189 (BOEING CO [US]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0016] - [0080] * * figures 4-9 * | by applicant | EP2808250 |