EP3608597 - CONNECTION FITTING FOR CONTROLLING THE FLOW DIRECTION OF A HEATING MEDIUM IN A HEATING BODY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.08.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Purmo Group Oy Ab PL 115 00121 Helsinki / FI | [2021/43] |
Former [2020/07] | For all designated states Rettig ICC B.V. Australielaan 6 6199 AA Maastricht-Airport / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VISENTIN, Eros Via Romagna 26 33080 Porcia (PN) / IT | 02 /
BRUSADIN, Luca Via Mantenga 27/A 33170 Pordenone / IT | [2020/07] | Representative(s) | Wildhack & Jellinek Patentanwälte Patentanwälte OG Landstraßer Hauptstraße 50 1030 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2023/23] | Wildhack & Jellinek Patentanwälte OG Landstraßer Hauptstraße 50 1030 Wien / AT | ||
Former [2020/07] | Wildhack & Jellinek Patentanwälte Landstraßer Hauptstraße 50 1030 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 19188581.3 | 26.07.2019 | [2020/07] | Priority number, date | AT20180050681 | 09.08.2018 Original published format: AT 506812018 | [2020/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3608597 | Date: | 12.02.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3608597 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F24D19/00, F16K11/083, F16K11/07, F16K11/085 | [2022/37] | CPC: |
F24D19/0012 (EP);
F16K11/0836 (EP,AT);
F16K11/0716 (EP);
F16K11/0856 (EP,AT);
F24D19/0073 (AT);
F24D19/1024 (AT);
F15B13/0406 (AT)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/07] | F24D19/00, F16K11/085 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/38] |
Former [2020/07] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ANSCHLUSSARMATUR ZUR STEUERUNG DER FLUSSRICHTUNG EINES HEIZUNGSMEDIUMS IN EINEM HEIZKÖRPER | [2020/07] | English: | CONNECTION FITTING FOR CONTROLLING THE FLOW DIRECTION OF A HEATING MEDIUM IN A HEATING BODY | [2020/07] | French: | ARMATURE DE RACCORDEMENT PERMETTANT DE COMMANDER LE SENS D'ÉCOULEMENT D'UN MILIEU DE CHAUFFAGE DANS UN RADIATEUR | [2020/07] | Examination procedure | 12.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/38] | 12.08.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.01.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 26.01.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.01.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 07.06.2023 | ES | 07.06.2023 | HR | 07.06.2023 | MC | 07.06.2023 | RO | 07.06.2023 | RS | 07.06.2023 | SK | 07.06.2023 | SM | 07.06.2023 | IE | 26.07.2023 | CH | 31.07.2023 | NO | 07.09.2023 | GR | 08.09.2023 | IS | 07.10.2023 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/25] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
MC | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
CH | 31.07.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/16] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
MC | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 07.06.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3430860 (MESROC GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,7,9-11,16 * column 5 - column 6; figures 1, 2 *; | [A]DE4419278 (WEIS HANS [DE]) [A] 15* figure 7 *; | [X]DE19607694 (NOCON THEODOR [DE]) [X] 1,8,10,11,13 * column 2 - column 3; figures 1-3 *; | [X]DE19854848 (SIEGLE MATTHIAS [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,7,10-16 * column 3 - column 10; figures 1-3, 6-8, 15; claims 6-8, 17, 20-23, 32 *; | [I]EP2843276 (NETZEL THOMAS [DE]) [I] 1-3,7,9,10,16 * paragraphs [0021] - [0023] - paragraphs [0032] - [0038] * |