EP3770881 - METHODS, COMPUTER PROGRAMS, APPARATUSES, A VEHICLE, AND A TRAFFIC ENTITY FOR UPDATING AN ENVIRONMENTAL MODEL OF A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.10.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.07.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.01.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.07.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volkswagen AG Berliner Ring 2 38440 Wolfsburg / DE | [2023/46] |
Former [2021/04] | For all designated states Volkswagen AG Berliner Ring 2 38440 Wolfsburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pfadler, Andreas Osloer Str. 110 13359 Berlin / DE | 02 /
Jornod, Guillaume Sonntagstraße 30 10245 Berlin / DE | [2023/46] |
Former [2021/04] | 01 /
Pfadler, Andreas Osloer Str. 110 13359 Berlin / DE | ||
02 /
Jornod, Guillaume Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft Sonntagstraße 30 10245 Berlin / DE | Representative(s) | 2SPL Patentanwälte PartG mbB Landaubogen 3 81373 München / DE | [2023/46] | Application number, filing date | 19188609.2 | 26.07.2019 | [2021/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3770881 | Date: | 27.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3770881 | Date: | 15.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06F18/00 | [2023/27] | CPC: |
G08G1/162 (EP);
G08G1/0112 (KR);
H04L67/12 (CN);
G08G1/163 (US);
G05D1/0246 (US);
G06V20/58 (EP);
G08G1/093 (EP);
G08G1/096791 (EP,US);
G08G1/0968 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2021/04] | G08G1/16, G06K9/00, G08G1/09, G08G1/0967 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/35] |
Former [2021/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, COMPUTERPROGRAMME, VORRICHTUNGEN, FAHRZEUG UND VERKEHRSEINHEIT ZUM AKTUALISIEREN EINES UMGEBUNGSMODELLS EINES FAHRZEUGS | [2021/04] | English: | METHODS, COMPUTER PROGRAMS, APPARATUSES, A VEHICLE, AND A TRAFFIC ENTITY FOR UPDATING AN ENVIRONMENTAL MODEL OF A VEHICLE | [2021/04] | French: | PROCÉDÉS, PROGRAMMES INFORMATIQUES, APPAREILS, VÉHICULE ET ENTITÉ DE TRAFIC POUR LA MISE À JOUR D'UN MODÈLE ENVIRONNEMENTAL D'UN VÉHICULE | [2021/04] | Examination procedure | 19.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/35] | 27.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 10.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 26.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.11.2023 | CZ | 15.11.2023 | DK | 15.11.2023 | EE | 15.11.2023 | ES | 15.11.2023 | HR | 15.11.2023 | IT | 15.11.2023 | LT | 15.11.2023 | LV | 15.11.2023 | NL | 15.11.2023 | PL | 15.11.2023 | RO | 15.11.2023 | RS | 15.11.2023 | SE | 15.11.2023 | SK | 15.11.2023 | SM | 15.11.2023 | BG | 15.02.2024 | NO | 15.02.2024 | GR | 16.02.2024 | IS | 15.03.2024 | PT | 15.03.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
CZ | 15.11.2023 | ||
DK | 15.11.2023 | ||
EE | 15.11.2023 | ||
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RO | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
SM | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
DK | 15.11.2023 | ||
EE | 15.11.2023 | ||
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
SM | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
DK | 15.11.2023 | ||
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
SM | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 15.11.2023 | |
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 16.02.2024 | |
IS | 15.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2017124781 (DOUILLARD BERTRAND ROBERT [US], et al); | [XI]WO2017192358 (PCMS HOLDINGS INC [US]); | [XI]US2018349785 (ZHENG HAO [US], et al) | Examination | DE102017217297 | by applicant | US7979173 | US8255144 | US8260482 | US2016139594 | US9896100 | KR101891612B |