EP3599736 - ZERO OFFSET CLOCK DISTRIBUTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.07.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Integrated Device Technology, Inc. 6024 Silver Creek Valley Road San Jose CA 95138 / US | [2024/16] |
Former [2020/05] | For all designated states Integrated Device Technology, Inc. 6024 Silver Creek Valley Road San Jose CA 95138 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUPERT, Michael John 131 Lanigan Crescent Ottawa, Ontario K2S 1G9 / CA | 02 /
DEN BROEDER, Ernst JG 3633 Diamondview Rd Kinburn, Ontario K0A 2H0 / CA | 03 /
GOLDIN, Leonid 18 Bentworth Crescent Ottawa, Ontario K2G 3X2 / CA | [2020/05] | Representative(s) | McKinnon, Alistair James WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [2024/16] |
Former [2020/05] | Gill, David Alan WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 19188641.5 | 26.07.2019 | [2020/05] | Priority number, date | US201862703739P | 26.07.2018 Original published format: US 201862703739 P | US201916521217 | 24.07.2019 Original published format: US201916521217 | [2020/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3599736 | Date: | 29.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3599736 | Date: | 17.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04L7/00, H04L25/49 | [2020/05] | CPC: |
H04L7/0008 (EP);
H04J3/0617 (CN);
G06F1/10 (US);
G06F1/0335 (US);
G06F1/12 (US);
H03L7/07 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/36] |
Former [2020/05] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERSATZFREIE TAKTVERTEILUNG | [2020/05] | English: | ZERO OFFSET CLOCK DISTRIBUTION | [2020/05] | French: | DISTRIBUTION D'HORLOGE À DÉCALAGE ZÉRO | [2020/05] | Examination procedure | 29.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/36] | 29.07.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1684519 (VIXS SYSTEMS INC [CA]) [X] 6-12 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0017]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0032]; figures 3, 4, 5, 6, 7, 8 * [I] 1-5; | [XI]US2018159541 (SPIJKER MENNO [CA]) [X] 6-12 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0030]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0050]; figures 3, 4 * [I] 1-5; | [XP]US10075284 (RODRIGUES SILVANA [CA], et al) [XP] 1-12* column 1, line 19 - column 2, line 67 * |