Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
17.07.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] |
27.03.2020 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
27.03.2020 | Request for examination filed | published on 29.04.2020 [2020/18] |
27.03.2020 | Change - designated states | published on 29.04.2020 [2020/18] |
03.01.2020 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 05.02.2020 [2020/06] |
02.08.2019 | Change - representative |