Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2020038975 | Global Dossier | 06.02.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102018118959 | 03.08.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110788889 | Global Dossier | 14.02.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102018118959 | 03.08.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3603865 | Global Dossier | 05.02.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102018118959 | 03.08.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN210525162U | 15.05.2020 | U | Priority number | Date | DE102018118959 | 03.08.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102018118959 | 21.11.2019 | B3 | Priority number | Date | DE102018118959 | 03.08.2018 |