EP3657835 - ACCESS METHOD OF USER EQUIPMENT, USER EQUIPMENT AND COMPUTER-READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/22] | ACCESS METHOD OF USER EQUIPMENT AND USER EQUIPMENT | ||
[2023/14] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.11.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/38] |
Former [2020/22] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Na Room 612 Building 1 No. 32 North Xizhimen Street Haidian Beijing, Beijing 100082 / CN | 02 /
ZHONG, Jingxue Room 612 Building 1 No. 32 North Xizhimen Street Haidian Beijing, Beijing 100082 / CN | 03 /
ZHONG, Weiwei Room 612 Building 1 No. 32 North Xizhimen Street Haidian Beijing, Beijing 100082 / CN | 04 /
CHEN, Jing Huawei Technologies Co.,Ltd., Intellectual Property Department F1-5F, Bantian, Longgang District shenzhen, Guangdong / CN | [2020/22] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [2023/38] |
Former [2020/22] | Kreuz, Georg Maria Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Riesstraße 25 80992 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19189975.6 | 22.09.2015 | [2020/22] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3657835 | Date: | 27.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3657835 | Date: | 20.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04W12/06, H04L9/40, H04W12/041, H04W12/0431, H04W12/062, // H04W8/04, H04W88/06 | [2023/14] | CPC: |
H04L63/08 (EP,KR,US);
H04W48/16 (KR,US);
H04W36/0038 (US);
H04W12/04 (KR);
H04W12/041 (EP,US);
H04W12/043 (US);
H04W12/0431 (EP,US);
H04W12/06 (KR);
H04W12/062 (EP,US);
H04W12/08 (KR);
H04W76/20 (US);
H04W8/04 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2020/22] | H04W12/06, H04L29/06, H04W12/04, // H04W8/04, H04W88/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/01] |
Former [2020/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ZUGANGSVERFAHREN FÜR EINE BENUTZERVORRICHTUNG, BENUTZERVORRICHTUNG UND COMPUTERLESBARES SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2023/14] | English: | ACCESS METHOD OF USER EQUIPMENT, USER EQUIPMENT AND COMPUTER-READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM | [2023/14] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ACCÈS D'ÉQUIPEMENT UTILISATEUR, ÉQUIPEMENT UTILISATEUR ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE LISIBLE PAR ORDINATEUR | [2023/14] |
Former [2020/22] | ZUGANGSVERFAHREN FÜR EINE BENUTZERVORRICHTUNG UND BENUTZERVORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2020/22] | ACCESS METHOD OF USER EQUIPMENT AND USER EQUIPMENT | ||
Former [2020/22] | PROCÉDÉ D'ACCÈS D'ÉQUIPEMENT UTILISATEUR ET ÉQUIPEMENT UTILISATEUR | Examination procedure | 24.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.11.2020 | Examination requested [2020/53] | 24.11.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 09.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15904348.8 / EP3340690 | Opposition(s) | 21.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.09.2023 | CZ | 20.09.2023 | DK | 20.09.2023 | EE | 20.09.2023 | ES | 20.09.2023 | FI | 20.09.2023 | HR | 20.09.2023 | IT | 20.09.2023 | LT | 20.09.2023 | LV | 20.09.2023 | MC | 20.09.2023 | NL | 20.09.2023 | PL | 20.09.2023 | RO | 20.09.2023 | RS | 20.09.2023 | SE | 20.09.2023 | SK | 20.09.2023 | SM | 20.09.2023 | IE | 22.09.2023 | LU | 22.09.2023 | BE | 30.09.2023 | CH | 30.09.2023 | NO | 20.12.2023 | GR | 21.12.2023 | IS | 20.01.2024 | PT | 22.01.2024 | DE | 03.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | AT | 20.09.2023 | |
CZ | 20.09.2023 | ||
DK | 20.09.2023 | ||
EE | 20.09.2023 | ||
ES | 20.09.2023 | ||
FI | 20.09.2023 | ||
HR | 20.09.2023 | ||
IT | 20.09.2023 | ||
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
LV | 20.09.2023 | ||
MC | 20.09.2023 | ||
NL | 20.09.2023 | ||
PL | 20.09.2023 | ||
RO | 20.09.2023 | ||
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
SE | 20.09.2023 | ||
SK | 20.09.2023 | ||
SM | 20.09.2023 | ||
IE | 22.09.2023 | ||
LU | 22.09.2023 | ||
CH | 30.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
IS | 20.01.2024 | ||
PT | 22.01.2024 | ||
DE | 03.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 20.09.2023 | |
CZ | 20.09.2023 | ||
DK | 20.09.2023 | ||
EE | 20.09.2023 | ||
ES | 20.09.2023 | ||
FI | 20.09.2023 | ||
HR | 20.09.2023 | ||
IT | 20.09.2023 | ||
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
LV | 20.09.2023 | ||
MC | 20.09.2023 | ||
NL | 20.09.2023 | ||
PL | 20.09.2023 | ||
RO | 20.09.2023 | ||
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
SE | 20.09.2023 | ||
SK | 20.09.2023 | ||
SM | 20.09.2023 | ||
IE | 22.09.2023 | ||
LU | 22.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
IS | 20.01.2024 | ||
PT | 22.01.2024 | ||
DE | 03.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | AT | 20.09.2023 | |
CZ | 20.09.2023 | ||
EE | 20.09.2023 | ||
ES | 20.09.2023 | ||
FI | 20.09.2023 | ||
HR | 20.09.2023 | ||
IT | 20.09.2023 | ||
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
LV | 20.09.2023 | ||
MC | 20.09.2023 | ||
NL | 20.09.2023 | ||
PL | 20.09.2023 | ||
RO | 20.09.2023 | ||
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
SE | 20.09.2023 | ||
SK | 20.09.2023 | ||
SM | 20.09.2023 | ||
LU | 22.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
IS | 20.01.2024 | ||
PT | 22.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 20.09.2023 | |
CZ | 20.09.2023 | ||
EE | 20.09.2023 | ||
ES | 20.09.2023 | ||
FI | 20.09.2023 | ||
HR | 20.09.2023 | ||
IT | 20.09.2023 | ||
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
LV | 20.09.2023 | ||
NL | 20.09.2023 | ||
PL | 20.09.2023 | ||
RO | 20.09.2023 | ||
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
SE | 20.09.2023 | ||
SK | 20.09.2023 | ||
SM | 20.09.2023 | ||
LU | 22.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
IS | 20.01.2024 | ||
PT | 22.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 20.09.2023 | |
CZ | 20.09.2023 | ||
EE | 20.09.2023 | ||
ES | 20.09.2023 | ||
FI | 20.09.2023 | ||
HR | 20.09.2023 | ||
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
LV | 20.09.2023 | ||
NL | 20.09.2023 | ||
PL | 20.09.2023 | ||
RO | 20.09.2023 | ||
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
SE | 20.09.2023 | ||
SK | 20.09.2023 | ||
SM | 20.09.2023 | ||
LU | 22.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
IS | 20.01.2024 | ||
PT | 22.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 20.09.2023 | |
CZ | 20.09.2023 | ||
EE | 20.09.2023 | ||
ES | 20.09.2023 | ||
FI | 20.09.2023 | ||
HR | 20.09.2023 | ||
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
LV | 20.09.2023 | ||
NL | 20.09.2023 | ||
RO | 20.09.2023 | ||
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
SE | 20.09.2023 | ||
SK | 20.09.2023 | ||
SM | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
IS | 20.01.2024 | ||
PT | 22.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 20.09.2023 | |
HR | 20.09.2023 | ||
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
LV | 20.09.2023 | ||
NL | 20.09.2023 | ||
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
SE | 20.09.2023 | ||
SM | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
IS | 20.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/14] | FI | 20.09.2023 | |
HR | 20.09.2023 | ||
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
LV | 20.09.2023 | ||
NL | 20.09.2023 | ||
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
SE | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 20.09.2023 | |
HR | 20.09.2023 | ||
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
LV | 20.09.2023 | ||
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
SE | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 20.09.2023 | |
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
SE | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 20.09.2023 | |
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2013181847 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 6, line 4 - page 12, line last *; | [A]US2014071907 (ROELAND DINAND [SE], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0090] - paragraph [0136] *; | [A]WO2014117811 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 1-15 * page 9, line 29 - page 19, line 35 *; | [A]US2015215777 (SIROTKIN ALEXANDER [IL], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0080] - paragraph [0145] *; | [A] - ALCATEL-LUCENT ET AL, "Mobile Equipment Identity signalling over WLAN", vol. CT WG1, no. Sanya, P.R. China; 20150525 - 20150529, (20150525), 3GPP DRAFT; C4-150819, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/CT4/Docs/, (20150525), XP050967442 [A] 1-15 * Subsection "Discussion" * |