EP3623783 - BELT, DEVICE AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.10.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.09.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ContiTech Antriebssysteme GmbH Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | [2020/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sattler, Heiko c/o ContiTech Antriebssysteme GmbH Vahrenwalder Str. 9 30165 Hannover / DE | [2020/12] | Representative(s) | Continental Corporation c/o Continental AG Intellectual Property Postfach 169 30001 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/12] | Finger, Karsten Continental Aktiengesellschaft Patente und Lizenzen Postfach 169 30001 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 19190158.6 | 06.08.2019 | [2020/12] | Priority number, date | DE201810215473 | 12.09.2018 Original published format: DE102018215473 | [2020/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3623783 | Date: | 18.03.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01L1/14, G01L5/10, F16G1/10, F16G1/12 | [2020/12] | CPC: |
G01L5/101 (EP);
F16G1/10 (EP);
F16G1/12 (EP);
G01L1/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/44] |
Former [2020/12] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RIEMEN, VORRICHTUNG UND SYSTEM | [2020/12] | English: | BELT, DEVICE AND SYSTEM | [2020/12] | French: | COURROIE, DISPOSITIF ET SYSTÈME | [2020/12] | Examination procedure | 14.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.09.2020 | Examination requested [2020/44] | 18.09.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 11.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6523400 (AHMED ADEL ABDEL AZIZ [US]) [A] 1,4,5,7 * figures 1a, 1b, 7 * * column 8, line 15 - column 11, line 21 * * column 13, line 61 - line 67 ** column 20, line 54 - column 21, line 5 *; | [I]US2009178902 (LYNN DAVID [IE], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0030] * * figures 1-4 * * figure 8 * * paragraph [0033] * |