EP3609054 - MOTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.12.2020 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hanon Systems 95, Sinilseo-ro Daedeok-gu Daejeon 34325 / KR | [2020/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IM, Ho Bin c/o Hanon Systems 95, Sinilseo-ro, Daedeok-gu 34325 Daejeon / KR | 02 /
KIM, Ho Youn c/o Hanon Systems 95, Sinilseo-ro, Daedeok-gu 34325 Daejeon / KR | 03 /
SHIN, Hyeon Jae c/o Hanon Systems 95, Sinilseo-ro, Daedeok-gu 34325 Daejeon / KR | 04 /
LEE, Jae Won c/o Hanon Systems 95, Sinilseo-ro, Daedeok-gu 34325 Daejeon / KR | 05 /
JUNG, Kyung Hun c/o Hanon Systems 95, Sinilseo-ro, Daedeok-gu 34325 Daejeon / KR | 06 /
CHO, Seong Kook c/o Hanon Systems 95, Sinilseo-ro, Daedeok-gu 34325 Daejeon / KR | [2020/07] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [2020/07] | Application number, filing date | 19190171.9 | 06.08.2019 | [2020/07] | Priority number, date | KR20180093498 | 10.08.2018 Original published format: KR 20180093498 | [2020/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3609054 | Date: | 12.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H02K5/10, H02K5/22, H02K11/33 | [2020/07] | CPC: |
H02K5/10 (EP);
H02K5/225 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H02K11/33 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01R12/53 (US);
H01R12/58 (US);
H05K5/0069 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/38] |
Former [2020/07] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MOTOR | [2020/07] | English: | MOTOR | [2020/07] | French: | MOTEUR | [2020/07] | Examination procedure | 06.08.2019 | Examination requested [2020/07] | 12.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002117914 (DOI HIROFUMI [JP], et al) [A] 1-17 * abstract *; | [A]US2016036305 (KAWATA HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-17* abstract *; | [I]KR20170078206 (HANON SYSTEMS [KR]) [I] 1-4,9-17 * paragraphs [0024] - [0028] - [0 46]; figures 3-6 *; | [XI]US2018048218 (IM HO BIN [KR], et al) [X] 1,4,9,10,14,15,17 * figures 3--11 * [I] 2,3,5-8,11-13,16; | [XI]KR20180018282 (HANON SYSTEMS [KR]) [X] 1,4,9,10,14,15,17 * paragraphs [0038] - [0049] - [0 62] , [0063]; figures 4-12 * [I] 2,3,5-8,11-13,16 | by applicant | JP2005117708 |