|
04.04.2025 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.06.2024 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.06.2024 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2024 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.04.2024 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2024 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2024 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.04.2024 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.04.2024 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.12.2023 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2023 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.12.2023 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.12.2023 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2023 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
87 |
|
21.12.2023 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
87 |
|
06.12.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.12.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.12.2023 |
Request for change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.12.2023 |
Request for change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.12.2023 |
Request for change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.11.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.11.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.11.2023 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.11.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.11.2023 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.09.2023 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.2023 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.09.2023 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.09.2023 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.2023 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
87 |
|
29.09.2023 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
87 |
|
20.06.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.06.2023 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
76 |
|
20.06.2023 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.06.2023 |
Description |
Search / examination |
75 |
|
20.06.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.2023 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.02.2023 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.02.2023 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.03.2022 |
Payment submission rejected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.01.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.01.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
31.01.2022 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
31.01.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.01.2022 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.01.2022 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.01.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2022 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.09.2021 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.09.2021 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.04.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.04.2021 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.04.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.2021 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.03.2021 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.03.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.03.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.03.2021 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.11.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.11.2020 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.10.2020 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.2020 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.07.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.07.2020 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.07.2020 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.07.2020 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.07.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2020 |
Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.12.2019 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.11.2019 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.10.2019 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.10.2019 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.10.2019 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.10.2019 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.2019 |
Modified abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.2019 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.2019 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.2019 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.08.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.08.2019 |
Description |
Search / examination |
75 |
|
06.08.2019 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.08.2019 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
06.08.2019 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.01.2017 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
114 |
|
03.01.2017 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
103 |